California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR140 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 06/13/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 140CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 72 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 13, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 23, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 9, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Cannella (Principal coauthor: Senator McGuire) (Coauthors: Senators Bates, Berryhill, Block, Gaines, Hall, Hertzberg, Leno, and Runner) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Olsen) MAY 5, 2016 Relative to foster care. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 140, Cannella. Foster Care Awareness Month. This measure would acknowledge the month of May 2016 as Foster Care Awareness Month. WHEREAS, The foster care system in the State of California is a network of government agencies, private, community, and faith-based organizations, families, and individuals working together to provide children and youth safe and supportive living situations when their families are unable to do so; and WHEREAS, The foster care system was developed in the early part of the 20th century based on the premise that a child is better off in a home, rather than an orphanage, even if the child only lives in that home temporarily; and WHEREAS, The goal of many foster care programs is to reunite children with their parents when their parents are able to provide safe and stable homes; and WHEREAS, About 53 percent of the children entering foster care successfully reunite with their parents; and WHEREAS, Many counties in the State of California have reduced the number of children and youth entering foster care by helping at-risk families access community services that provide the skills and resources these families need to effectively care for their children; and WHEREAS, Although the State of California recognizes the importance of maintaining strong, vital connections among foster children and youth, their siblings, and extended families, the state acknowledges that 9 percent will exit foster care to live with nonparent relatives or guardians and 38 percent of children entering foster care will not be reunited with their families; and WHEREAS, To ensure those children receive the best care, the State of California has developed many programs designed to find permanent families for children in foster care, assist older youth in securing meaningful, supportive transitions from foster care, and expand the support of relatives, foster parents, and adoptive caregivers who provide permanent homes to foster children; and WHEREAS, The State of California continues to revise its foster care policies in order to develop a comprehensive approach to assessing the needs of children and families, finding home-based family care placements, supporting these placements with services, and developing thorough information about and an understanding of how children and youth are affected by and benefit from state foster care programs; and WHEREAS, The State of California is committed to improving the lives of all children and youth touched by the child welfare system by working in partnership with all organizations involved in the foster care system and the adoption process; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the month of May 2016 as Foster Care Awareness Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.