California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR149 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/09/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 149CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 182 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Gaines JUNE 9, 2016 Relative to the Firefighter Michael "Mikey" Hallenbeck Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 149, Gaines. Firefighter Michael "Mikey" Hallenbeck Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 50 from Mount Ralston Road to Echo Summit as the Firefighter Michael "Mikey" Hallenbeck Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, In 2015, Michael "Mikey" Hallenbeck, a resident of Shingle Springs, California, was in his first year as a firefighter working as a member of Organized Crew 36 of the Lake Tahoe Basin Management Unit of the United States Forest Service, which is responsible for 191,000 acres of national forest lands; and WHEREAS, Prior to becoming a firefighter, Michael had been employed as a ski lift operator in the Lake Tahoe area; and WHEREAS, In early August 2015, the Sierra Fire started in the jurisdiction of Michael's firefighting unit; and WHEREAS, Michael was struck by a falling tree while fighting to control the blaze; and WHEREAS, Michael, 21, later succumbed to the injuries he tragically sustained while combating the Sierra Fire; and WHEREAS, Michael's sacrifice serves as a reminder of the heroic work done by men and women, like Michael, who put themselves in danger, and of the importance of continuing to learn from these misfortunes and adjusting safety measures during the arduous wildfire season; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate to commemorate Firefighter Michael "Mikey" Hallenbeck's service and ultimate sacrifice, and to designate a portion of State Highway Route 50 in El Dorado County in his honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 50 from the intersection with Mount Ralston Road (post mile R61.845) to Echo Summit (post mile R66.483) in the County of El Dorado as the Firefighter Michael "Mikey" Hallenbeck Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting appropriate signs including this special designation, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.