California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR154 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/16/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 154CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 104 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 16, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 11, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Liu JUNE 15, 2016 Relative to pain awareness. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 154, Liu. Pain Awareness Month and Women In Pain Awareness Day. This measure would recognize the month of September 2016 as Pain Awareness Month. The measure would also recognize September 23, 2016, as Women In Pain Awareness Day. WHEREAS, More than 100 million Americans live with chronic pain caused by various diseases or disorders, and nearly 25 million Americans suffer with acute pain each year; and WHEREAS, Though medical knowledge and technology exist to relieve or greatly ease pain, most pain is untreated, undertreated, or improperly treated, and many health care professionals are still unaware of how to effectively treat pain; and WHEREAS, People who suffer from chronic pain often are stigmatized, marginalized, and not informed about the right to effective pain assessment and management, and most people with pain, including those at the end of life, get little or no relief; and WHEREAS, Women have a higher prevalence than men of syndromes and diseases associated with chronic pain, such as fibromyalgia, complex pain syndrome, and osteoarthritis, and women respond differently to certain analgesics; and WHEREAS, Women's pain reports are taken less seriously than those of men, and women receive less aggressive treatment than men for their pain; and WHEREAS, Women have developed a number of coping mechanisms to deal with pain, and this may contribute to a general perception that they can endure more pain and that their pain does not need to be taken as seriously; and WHEREAS, Women more frequently report pain to a health care provider, but are more likely to have their pain reports discounted as emotional or psychogenic and, therefore, not real; and WHEREAS, The California-based Partners for Understanding Pain is a coalition of pain sufferers, physicians, nurses, social workers, pharmacists, therapists, civic leaders, nonprofit organizations, and health care businesses whose mission is to improve the quality of life for people in California experiencing pain; and WHEREAS, It is the collective mission of this movement to provide practical information for people with pain, inform health care professionals about pain management, and serve as an advocate for people experiencing pain; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes and declares the month of September 2016 as Pain Awareness Month, and calls upon all Californians to observe the month by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities, and by learning how to improve the quality of life for people in California suffering from pain; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes September 23, 2016, as Women In Pain Awareness Day to draw public attention to the important need to raise awareness concerning gender disparities in pain assessment and treatment in the United States; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.