BILL NUMBER: SCR 51ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE JULY 2, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 27, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Stone APRIL 30, 2015 Relative to the Special Deputy Frank Hamilton Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 51, Stone. Special Deputy Frank Hamilton Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a portion of State Highway Route 371 in the County of Riverside as the Special Deputy Frank Hamilton Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, In 1895, Frank Hamilton, a Native American and a Cahuilla tribal member from the Anza area, was working as a Riverside County special deputy sheriff. Hamilton acted as a law enforcement officer for the Riverside County Sheriff's Office in the areas surrounding the Cahuilla and Ramona Reservations (Anza) area, including the area surrounding the town of San Jacinto. Hamilton had family ties to both reservations; and WHEREAS, Hamilton, who was 34 years of age and unmarried, was the son of a prominent rancher, James Hamilton, namesake of the Hamilton School in the community of Anza. He resided at the family ranch, which was first in Cahuilla, now present day Anza. The ranch then moved to Kenworthy, presently known as Garner Valley; and WHEREAS, In the early years of Riverside County, special deputies were used throughout the county to support the operation of the Riverside County Sheriff's Office. In the first few years of its existence, the Riverside County Sheriff's Office consisted of one sheriff and two deputy sheriffs; and WHEREAS, Riverside County was incorporated on May 9, 1893. Special Deputy Frank Hamilton was the first deputy sheriff in Riverside County to be murdered in the line of duty and his killing was the subject of the first murder trial held in Riverside County's history; and WHEREAS, On the evening of April 8, 1895, Special Deputy Frank Hamilton was in the town of San Jacinto tending to his duties as a special deputy sheriff. He was in the town saloon when a disagreement erupted between him and Charles Marshall, who had greeted Special Deputy Frank Hamilton with a racial epithet; and WHEREAS, Marshall became enraged over the disagreement and left. Special Deputy Frank Hamilton had told Marshall to go away and that he did not want any trouble with him, but Marshall retrieved a revolver and went in search of Special Deputy Frank Hamilton; and WHEREAS, Marshall located Special Deputy Frank Hamilton in an alleyway adjacent to the town saloon, and, without warning, began firing, hitting Special Deputy Frank Hamilton twice as he returned fire and managed to wound Marshall; and WHEREAS, Special Deputy Frank Hamilton succumbed to his gunshot wounds the following day, April 9, 1895; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 371 from Howard Road to Tribal Road near the community of Anza in Riverside County as the Special Deputy Frank Hamilton Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and the author for appropriate distribution.