California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR42 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/31/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SR 42ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 31, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 19, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senators Nguyen, Anderson, Bates, Berryhill, Cannella, Huff, Moorlach, Pan, and Wieckowski AUGUST 19, 2015 Relative to India's Independence Day LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST HOUSE OR SENATE RESOLUTIONS DO NOT CONTAIN A DIGEST WHEREAS, As the day began on August 15, 1947, at the stroke of midnight, the first Prime Minister of India, Jawaharlal Nehru, gave his famous Tryst with Destiny speech proclaiming India's independence; and WHEREAS, The Tryst with Destiny speech, considered to be one of the greatest speeches of all time, captured the essence of the 100-year nonviolent Indian freedom struggle against British colonial rule in India; and WHEREAS, India's Independence Day is one of the most important national holidays in India. The biggest event of the day takes place in Delhi where the Prime Minister hoists the national flag at the Red Fort, delivers a nationally televised speech that highlights the achievements of the government, discusses current issues and future plans for progress, and pays tribute to the leaders of India's struggle for freedom; and WHEREAS, India's Independence Day is celebrated on August 15 of each year to commemorate its independence. It was celebrated by 400 million Indians in 1947, and today is celebrated by more than one billion people living in India and many people living in other parts of the world, including California, which is home to the largest population of Asian Indians in the United States; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby recognizes August 15, 2015, as India's Independence Day, and urges all Californians to join in celebrating India's independence; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.