California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1279 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/15/2017

                    Enrolled  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 11, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 13, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 01, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  July 11, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  May 30, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 25, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 06, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1279Introduced by Assembly Member Salas(Coauthors: Assembly Members Cunningham and Fong)(Coauthor: Senator Galgiani)February 17, 2017 An act to add Chapter 18.5 (commencing with Section 26165) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1279, Salas. Valley fever.Existing law requires the State Department of Public Health to establish a list of reportable communicable and noncommunicable diseases and conditions and specify the timeliness requirements related to the reporting of each disease and condition. Existing law also supports research into the development of a vaccine to protect against valley fever (coccidioidomycosis).This bill would require the department to develop outreach programs to educate the public about valley fever.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Chapter 18.5 (commencing with Section 26165) is added to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: CHAPTER 18.5. Valley Fever26165. The State Department of Public Health shall develop and implement public outreach programs to educate the public about coccidioidomycosis, commonly referred to as valley fever.

 Enrolled  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 11, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 13, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 01, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  July 11, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  May 30, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 25, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 06, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1279Introduced by Assembly Member Salas(Coauthors: Assembly Members Cunningham and Fong)(Coauthor: Senator Galgiani)February 17, 2017 An act to add Chapter 18.5 (commencing with Section 26165) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1279, Salas. Valley fever.Existing law requires the State Department of Public Health to establish a list of reportable communicable and noncommunicable diseases and conditions and specify the timeliness requirements related to the reporting of each disease and condition. Existing law also supports research into the development of a vaccine to protect against valley fever (coccidioidomycosis).This bill would require the department to develop outreach programs to educate the public about valley fever.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 11, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 13, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 01, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  July 11, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  May 30, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 25, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 06, 2017

Enrolled  September 15, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  September 11, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  September 13, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  September 01, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  July 11, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  May 30, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  April 25, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  April 06, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 1279

Introduced by Assembly Member Salas(Coauthors: Assembly Members Cunningham and Fong)(Coauthor: Senator Galgiani)February 17, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Salas(Coauthors: Assembly Members Cunningham and Fong)(Coauthor: Senator Galgiani)
February 17, 2017

 An act to add Chapter 18.5 (commencing with Section 26165) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1279, Salas. Valley fever.

Existing law requires the State Department of Public Health to establish a list of reportable communicable and noncommunicable diseases and conditions and specify the timeliness requirements related to the reporting of each disease and condition. Existing law also supports research into the development of a vaccine to protect against valley fever (coccidioidomycosis).This bill would require the department to develop outreach programs to educate the public about valley fever.

Existing law requires the State Department of Public Health to establish a list of reportable communicable and noncommunicable diseases and conditions and specify the timeliness requirements related to the reporting of each disease and condition. Existing law also supports research into the development of a vaccine to protect against valley fever (coccidioidomycosis).

This bill would require the department to develop outreach programs to educate the public about valley fever.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Chapter 18.5 (commencing with Section 26165) is added to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: CHAPTER 18.5. Valley Fever26165. The State Department of Public Health shall develop and implement public outreach programs to educate the public about coccidioidomycosis, commonly referred to as valley fever.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Chapter 18.5 (commencing with Section 26165) is added to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: CHAPTER 18.5. Valley Fever26165. The State Department of Public Health shall develop and implement public outreach programs to educate the public about coccidioidomycosis, commonly referred to as valley fever.

SECTION 1. Chapter 18.5 (commencing with Section 26165) is added to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

 CHAPTER 18.5. Valley Fever26165. The State Department of Public Health shall develop and implement public outreach programs to educate the public about coccidioidomycosis, commonly referred to as valley fever.

 CHAPTER 18.5. Valley Fever26165. The State Department of Public Health shall develop and implement public outreach programs to educate the public about coccidioidomycosis, commonly referred to as valley fever.

 CHAPTER 18.5. Valley Fever

 CHAPTER 18.5. Valley Fever

26165. The State Department of Public Health shall develop and implement public outreach programs to educate the public about coccidioidomycosis, commonly referred to as valley fever.



26165. The State Department of Public Health shall develop and implement public outreach programs to educate the public about coccidioidomycosis, commonly referred to as valley fever.