California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB184 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/07/2017

                    Enrolled  September 07, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  August 31, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 05, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  May 23, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 184Introduced by Assembly Member Berman(Coauthors: Assembly Members Chiu, Cunningham, Mullin, Mark Stone, Ting, and Gonzalez Fletcher)(Coauthors: Senators Hertzberg and Hill)January 19, 2017 An act to amend Section 30968 of the Public Resources Code, relating to sea level rise. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 184, Berman. Sea level rise planning: database.Existing law requires the Natural Resources Agency, in collaboration with the Ocean Protection Council, to create, update biannually, and post on an Internet Web site a Planning for Sea Level Rise Database describing steps being taken throughout the state to prepare for, and adapt to, sea level rise. Existing law further requires that various public agencies and private entities provide to the agency, on a biannual basis, sea level rise planning information, as defined, that is under the control or jurisdiction of the public agencies or private entities, and requires the agency to determine the information necessary for inclusion in the database, as prescribed. Existing law repeals these provisions on January 1, 2018.This bill would postpone that repeal until January 1, 2023.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 30968 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read:30968. This division shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2023, deletes or extends that date.

 Enrolled  September 07, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  August 31, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 05, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  May 23, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 184Introduced by Assembly Member Berman(Coauthors: Assembly Members Chiu, Cunningham, Mullin, Mark Stone, Ting, and Gonzalez Fletcher)(Coauthors: Senators Hertzberg and Hill)January 19, 2017 An act to amend Section 30968 of the Public Resources Code, relating to sea level rise. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 184, Berman. Sea level rise planning: database.Existing law requires the Natural Resources Agency, in collaboration with the Ocean Protection Council, to create, update biannually, and post on an Internet Web site a Planning for Sea Level Rise Database describing steps being taken throughout the state to prepare for, and adapt to, sea level rise. Existing law further requires that various public agencies and private entities provide to the agency, on a biannual basis, sea level rise planning information, as defined, that is under the control or jurisdiction of the public agencies or private entities, and requires the agency to determine the information necessary for inclusion in the database, as prescribed. Existing law repeals these provisions on January 1, 2018.This bill would postpone that repeal until January 1, 2023.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 07, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  August 31, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 05, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  May 23, 2017

Enrolled  September 07, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  August 31, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  September 05, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  May 23, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 184

Introduced by Assembly Member Berman(Coauthors: Assembly Members Chiu, Cunningham, Mullin, Mark Stone, Ting, and Gonzalez Fletcher)(Coauthors: Senators Hertzberg and Hill)January 19, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Berman(Coauthors: Assembly Members Chiu, Cunningham, Mullin, Mark Stone, Ting, and Gonzalez Fletcher)(Coauthors: Senators Hertzberg and Hill)
January 19, 2017

 An act to amend Section 30968 of the Public Resources Code, relating to sea level rise. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 184, Berman. Sea level rise planning: database.

Existing law requires the Natural Resources Agency, in collaboration with the Ocean Protection Council, to create, update biannually, and post on an Internet Web site a Planning for Sea Level Rise Database describing steps being taken throughout the state to prepare for, and adapt to, sea level rise. Existing law further requires that various public agencies and private entities provide to the agency, on a biannual basis, sea level rise planning information, as defined, that is under the control or jurisdiction of the public agencies or private entities, and requires the agency to determine the information necessary for inclusion in the database, as prescribed. Existing law repeals these provisions on January 1, 2018.This bill would postpone that repeal until January 1, 2023.

Existing law requires the Natural Resources Agency, in collaboration with the Ocean Protection Council, to create, update biannually, and post on an Internet Web site a Planning for Sea Level Rise Database describing steps being taken throughout the state to prepare for, and adapt to, sea level rise. Existing law further requires that various public agencies and private entities provide to the agency, on a biannual basis, sea level rise planning information, as defined, that is under the control or jurisdiction of the public agencies or private entities, and requires the agency to determine the information necessary for inclusion in the database, as prescribed. Existing law repeals these provisions on January 1, 2018.

This bill would postpone that repeal until January 1, 2023.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 30968 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read:30968. This division shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2023, deletes or extends that date.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 30968 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read:30968. This division shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2023, deletes or extends that date.

SECTION 1. Section 30968 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

30968. This division shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2023, deletes or extends that date.

30968. This division shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2023, deletes or extends that date.

30968. This division shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2023, deletes or extends that date.



30968. This division shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2023, deletes or extends that date.