Amended IN Senate August 15, 2018 Amended IN Senate August 07, 2018 Amended IN Assembly April 12, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 21, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 05, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1862Introduced by Assembly Member Santiago Members Santiago, Chiu, and McCartyJanuary 11, 2018 An act relating to community colleges.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1862, as amended, Santiago. Community colleges: waiver of student fees.Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law authorizes the establishment of community college districts under the administration of community college governing boards, and authorizes these districts to provide instruction at community college campuses throughout the state. Existing law requires community college district governing boards to charge students an enrollment fee of $46 per unit per semester. Existing law requires the board of governors to waive this fee for students meeting prescribed requirements.Existing law also establishes the California College Promise, administered by the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, which distributes funding, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to each community college meeting prescribed requirements to be used to, among other things, accomplish specified policy goals and waive student fees for one academic year for first-time students who are enrolled in 12 or more semester units or the equivalent at the college and complete and submit either a Free Application for Federal Student Aid or a California Dream Act application.This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact later legislation to waive student fees for 2 academic years of attendance at any community college in California.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact later legislation to waive student fees for two academic years of attendance at any community college in California. Amended IN Senate August 15, 2018 Amended IN Senate August 07, 2018 Amended IN Assembly April 12, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 21, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 05, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1862Introduced by Assembly Member Santiago Members Santiago, Chiu, and McCartyJanuary 11, 2018 An act relating to community colleges.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1862, as amended, Santiago. Community colleges: waiver of student fees.Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law authorizes the establishment of community college districts under the administration of community college governing boards, and authorizes these districts to provide instruction at community college campuses throughout the state. Existing law requires community college district governing boards to charge students an enrollment fee of $46 per unit per semester. Existing law requires the board of governors to waive this fee for students meeting prescribed requirements.Existing law also establishes the California College Promise, administered by the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, which distributes funding, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to each community college meeting prescribed requirements to be used to, among other things, accomplish specified policy goals and waive student fees for one academic year for first-time students who are enrolled in 12 or more semester units or the equivalent at the college and complete and submit either a Free Application for Federal Student Aid or a California Dream Act application.This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact later legislation to waive student fees for 2 academic years of attendance at any community college in California.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Amended IN Senate August 15, 2018 Amended IN Senate August 07, 2018 Amended IN Assembly April 12, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 21, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 05, 2018 Amended IN Senate August 15, 2018 Amended IN Senate August 07, 2018 Amended IN Assembly April 12, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 21, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 05, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1862 Introduced by Assembly Member Santiago Members Santiago, Chiu, and McCartyJanuary 11, 2018 Introduced by Assembly Member Santiago Members Santiago, Chiu, and McCarty January 11, 2018 An act relating to community colleges. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1862, as amended, Santiago. Community colleges: waiver of student fees. Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law authorizes the establishment of community college districts under the administration of community college governing boards, and authorizes these districts to provide instruction at community college campuses throughout the state. Existing law requires community college district governing boards to charge students an enrollment fee of $46 per unit per semester. Existing law requires the board of governors to waive this fee for students meeting prescribed requirements.Existing law also establishes the California College Promise, administered by the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, which distributes funding, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to each community college meeting prescribed requirements to be used to, among other things, accomplish specified policy goals and waive student fees for one academic year for first-time students who are enrolled in 12 or more semester units or the equivalent at the college and complete and submit either a Free Application for Federal Student Aid or a California Dream Act application.This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact later legislation to waive student fees for 2 academic years of attendance at any community college in California. Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law authorizes the establishment of community college districts under the administration of community college governing boards, and authorizes these districts to provide instruction at community college campuses throughout the state. Existing law requires community college district governing boards to charge students an enrollment fee of $46 per unit per semester. Existing law requires the board of governors to waive this fee for students meeting prescribed requirements. Existing law also establishes the California College Promise, administered by the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, which distributes funding, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to each community college meeting prescribed requirements to be used to, among other things, accomplish specified policy goals and waive student fees for one academic year for first-time students who are enrolled in 12 or more semester units or the equivalent at the college and complete and submit either a Free Application for Federal Student Aid or a California Dream Act application. This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact later legislation to waive student fees for 2 academic years of attendance at any community college in California. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact later legislation to waive student fees for two academic years of attendance at any community college in California. The people of the State of California do enact as follows: ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows: SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact later legislation to waive student fees for two academic years of attendance at any community college in California. SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact later legislation to waive student fees for two academic years of attendance at any community college in California. SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact later legislation to waive student fees for two academic years of attendance at any community college in California. ### SECTION 1.