California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB282 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/16/2018

                    Amended IN  Senate  May 16, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  March 15, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  January 03, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 282Introduced by Assembly Members Jones-Sawyer and Bonta Member Jones-SawyerFebruary 02, 2017An act to amend Section 401 of the Penal Code, relating to suicide.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 282, as amended, Jones-Sawyer. Aiding, advising, or encouraging suicide: exemption from prosecution.Existing law, the End of Life Option Act, until January 1, 2026, authorizes an adult who meets certain qualifications and who has been determined by his or her attending physician to be suffering from a terminal disease to request a prescription for an aid-in-dying drug. The act, with some exceptions, provides immunity from civil or criminal liability for specified actions taken in compliance with the act. Actions taken in accordance with the act do not, for any purpose, constitute suicide, assisted suicide, homicide, or elder abuse under the law.Existing law makes a person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide guilty of a felony.This bill would prohibit a person whose actions are compliant with the End of Life Option Act from being prosecuted for deliberately aiding, advising, or encouraging suicide.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 401 of the Penal Code is amended to read:401. (a) Every Any person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide is guilty of a felony.(b) A person whose actions are compliant with the provisions of the End of Life Option Act (Part 1.85 (commencing with Section 443) of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code) shall not be prosecuted under this section.

 Amended IN  Senate  May 16, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  March 15, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  January 03, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 282Introduced by Assembly Members Jones-Sawyer and Bonta Member Jones-SawyerFebruary 02, 2017An act to amend Section 401 of the Penal Code, relating to suicide.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 282, as amended, Jones-Sawyer. Aiding, advising, or encouraging suicide: exemption from prosecution.Existing law, the End of Life Option Act, until January 1, 2026, authorizes an adult who meets certain qualifications and who has been determined by his or her attending physician to be suffering from a terminal disease to request a prescription for an aid-in-dying drug. The act, with some exceptions, provides immunity from civil or criminal liability for specified actions taken in compliance with the act. Actions taken in accordance with the act do not, for any purpose, constitute suicide, assisted suicide, homicide, or elder abuse under the law.Existing law makes a person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide guilty of a felony.This bill would prohibit a person whose actions are compliant with the End of Life Option Act from being prosecuted for deliberately aiding, advising, or encouraging suicide.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Amended IN  Senate  May 16, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  March 15, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  January 03, 2018

Amended IN  Senate  May 16, 2018
Amended IN  Senate  March 15, 2018
Amended IN  Assembly  January 03, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 282

Introduced by Assembly Members Jones-Sawyer and Bonta Member Jones-SawyerFebruary 02, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Members Jones-Sawyer and Bonta Member Jones-Sawyer
February 02, 2017

An act to amend Section 401 of the Penal Code, relating to suicide.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 282, as amended, Jones-Sawyer. Aiding, advising, or encouraging suicide: exemption from prosecution.

Existing law, the End of Life Option Act, until January 1, 2026, authorizes an adult who meets certain qualifications and who has been determined by his or her attending physician to be suffering from a terminal disease to request a prescription for an aid-in-dying drug. The act, with some exceptions, provides immunity from civil or criminal liability for specified actions taken in compliance with the act. Actions taken in accordance with the act do not, for any purpose, constitute suicide, assisted suicide, homicide, or elder abuse under the law.Existing law makes a person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide guilty of a felony.This bill would prohibit a person whose actions are compliant with the End of Life Option Act from being prosecuted for deliberately aiding, advising, or encouraging suicide.

Existing law, the End of Life Option Act, until January 1, 2026, authorizes an adult who meets certain qualifications and who has been determined by his or her attending physician to be suffering from a terminal disease to request a prescription for an aid-in-dying drug. The act, with some exceptions, provides immunity from civil or criminal liability for specified actions taken in compliance with the act. Actions taken in accordance with the act do not, for any purpose, constitute suicide, assisted suicide, homicide, or elder abuse under the law.

Existing law makes a person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide guilty of a felony.

This bill would prohibit a person whose actions are compliant with the End of Life Option Act from being prosecuted for deliberately aiding, advising, or encouraging suicide.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 401 of the Penal Code is amended to read:401. (a) Every Any person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide is guilty of a felony.(b) A person whose actions are compliant with the provisions of the End of Life Option Act (Part 1.85 (commencing with Section 443) of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code) shall not be prosecuted under this section.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 401 of the Penal Code is amended to read:401. (a) Every Any person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide is guilty of a felony.(b) A person whose actions are compliant with the provisions of the End of Life Option Act (Part 1.85 (commencing with Section 443) of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code) shall not be prosecuted under this section.

SECTION 1. Section 401 of the Penal Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

401. (a) Every Any person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide is guilty of a felony.(b) A person whose actions are compliant with the provisions of the End of Life Option Act (Part 1.85 (commencing with Section 443) of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code) shall not be prosecuted under this section.

401. (a) Every Any person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide is guilty of a felony.(b) A person whose actions are compliant with the provisions of the End of Life Option Act (Part 1.85 (commencing with Section 443) of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code) shall not be prosecuted under this section.

401. (a) Every Any person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide is guilty of a felony.(b) A person whose actions are compliant with the provisions of the End of Life Option Act (Part 1.85 (commencing with Section 443) of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code) shall not be prosecuted under this section.



401. (a) Every Any person who deliberately aids, advises, or encourages another to commit suicide is guilty of a felony.

(b) A person whose actions are compliant with the provisions of the End of Life Option Act (Part 1.85 (commencing with Section 443) of Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code) shall not be prosecuted under this section.