California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2838 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/31/2018

                    Enrolled  August 31, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 29, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  May 22, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2838Introduced by Assembly Member LowFebruary 16, 2018 An act to amend Section 19961.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2838, Low. Gambling: local ordinances.Existing law, the Gambling Control Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of various legalized gambling activities and establishments by the California Gambling Control Commission and the investigation and enforcement of those activities and establishments by the Department of Justice. Under existing law, any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, is required to be submitted to the Department of Justice for review and comment before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county.This bill would require the Department of Justice to review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 19961.1 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read:19961.1. Any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, shall be submitted to the department for review and comment, before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county. The department shall review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.

 Enrolled  August 31, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 29, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  May 22, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2838Introduced by Assembly Member LowFebruary 16, 2018 An act to amend Section 19961.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2838, Low. Gambling: local ordinances.Existing law, the Gambling Control Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of various legalized gambling activities and establishments by the California Gambling Control Commission and the investigation and enforcement of those activities and establishments by the Department of Justice. Under existing law, any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, is required to be submitted to the Department of Justice for review and comment before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county.This bill would require the Department of Justice to review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 31, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 29, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  May 22, 2018

Enrolled  August 31, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  August 29, 2018
Amended IN  Senate  May 22, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 2838

Introduced by Assembly Member LowFebruary 16, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Low
February 16, 2018

 An act to amend Section 19961.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 2838, Low. Gambling: local ordinances.

Existing law, the Gambling Control Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of various legalized gambling activities and establishments by the California Gambling Control Commission and the investigation and enforcement of those activities and establishments by the Department of Justice. Under existing law, any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, is required to be submitted to the Department of Justice for review and comment before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county.This bill would require the Department of Justice to review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.

Existing law, the Gambling Control Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of various legalized gambling activities and establishments by the California Gambling Control Commission and the investigation and enforcement of those activities and establishments by the Department of Justice. Under existing law, any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, is required to be submitted to the Department of Justice for review and comment before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county.

This bill would require the Department of Justice to review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 19961.1 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read:19961.1. Any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, shall be submitted to the department for review and comment, before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county. The department shall review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 19961.1 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read:19961.1. Any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, shall be submitted to the department for review and comment, before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county. The department shall review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.

SECTION 1. Section 19961.1 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

19961.1. Any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, shall be submitted to the department for review and comment, before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county. The department shall review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.

19961.1. Any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, shall be submitted to the department for review and comment, before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county. The department shall review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.

19961.1. Any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, shall be submitted to the department for review and comment, before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county. The department shall review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.



19961.1. Any amendment to a city or county ordinance relating to gambling establishments, or the Gambling Control Act, shall be submitted to the department for review and comment, before the ordinance is adopted by the city or county. The department shall review and comment on any submitted ordinance within 60 days of receiving the ordinance.