California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB289 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/06/2017

                    Enrolled  July 06, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  April 20, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 289Introduced by Assembly Member GrayFebruary 02, 2017 An act to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 289, Gray. Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: update.The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read:8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.

 Enrolled  July 06, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  April 20, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 289Introduced by Assembly Member GrayFebruary 02, 2017 An act to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 289, Gray. Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: update.The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  July 06, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  April 20, 2017

Enrolled  July 06, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  April 20, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 289

Introduced by Assembly Member GrayFebruary 02, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Gray
February 02, 2017

 An act to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 289, Gray. Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan: update.

The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.

The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. That act also required the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan by July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. 

This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every 5 years thereafter.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read:8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read:8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.

SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.

8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.

8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.



8570.4. The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2019, and every five years thereafter.