California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB639 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/06/2017

                    Enrolled  July 06, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 04, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 639Introduced by Assembly Member ObernolteFebruary 14, 2017 An act to add Section 14609 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 639, Obernolte. Department of General Services: contracts: electronic submissionExisting law establishes the Department of General Services to provide centralized services including, but not limited to, planning, acquisition, construction, and maintenance of state buildings and property; purchasing; printing; architectural services; administrative hearings; government claims; and accounting services. The State Contract Act generally requires that projects be under the charge and control of the department, except for projects under the jurisdiction of other specified departments.This bill would require the department to develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 14609 is added to the Government Code, to read:14609. The department shall develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.

 Enrolled  July 06, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 04, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 639Introduced by Assembly Member ObernolteFebruary 14, 2017 An act to add Section 14609 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 639, Obernolte. Department of General Services: contracts: electronic submissionExisting law establishes the Department of General Services to provide centralized services including, but not limited to, planning, acquisition, construction, and maintenance of state buildings and property; purchasing; printing; architectural services; administrative hearings; government claims; and accounting services. The State Contract Act generally requires that projects be under the charge and control of the department, except for projects under the jurisdiction of other specified departments.This bill would require the department to develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  July 06, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 04, 2017

Enrolled  July 06, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  July 03, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  May 04, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 639

Introduced by Assembly Member ObernolteFebruary 14, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Obernolte
February 14, 2017

 An act to add Section 14609 to the Government Code, relating to state government. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 639, Obernolte. Department of General Services: contracts: electronic submission

Existing law establishes the Department of General Services to provide centralized services including, but not limited to, planning, acquisition, construction, and maintenance of state buildings and property; purchasing; printing; architectural services; administrative hearings; government claims; and accounting services. The State Contract Act generally requires that projects be under the charge and control of the department, except for projects under the jurisdiction of other specified departments.This bill would require the department to develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.

Existing law establishes the Department of General Services to provide centralized services including, but not limited to, planning, acquisition, construction, and maintenance of state buildings and property; purchasing; printing; architectural services; administrative hearings; government claims; and accounting services. The State Contract Act generally requires that projects be under the charge and control of the department, except for projects under the jurisdiction of other specified departments.

This bill would require the department to develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 14609 is added to the Government Code, to read:14609. The department shall develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 14609 is added to the Government Code, to read:14609. The department shall develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.

SECTION 1. Section 14609 is added to the Government Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

14609. The department shall develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.

14609. The department shall develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.

14609. The department shall develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.



14609. The department shall develop procedures authorizing the submittal of electronic signatures and documents by all parties on contracts that are covered by the State Contracting Manual.