California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB669 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/14/2017

                    CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 669Introduced by Assembly Member BermanFebruary 14, 2017 An act to amend Section 88651 of the Education Code, relating to economic development. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 669, as introduced, Berman. Economic development: California Community Colleges Economic and Workforce Development Program.Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges Economic and Workforce Development Program. Existing law provides for the awarding of grants for this program, and provides that this program shall only be implemented during fiscal years for which funds are appropriated for these purposes. Existing law repeals the program on January 1, 2018.This bill would make the program inoperative on July 1, 2023, and make the repeal date for the program January 1, 2024, thereby extending the provisions governing the program until those dates.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 88651 of the Education Code is amended to read:88651. This part shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, become inoperative on July 1, 2023, and as of that date January 1, 2024, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 669Introduced by Assembly Member BermanFebruary 14, 2017 An act to amend Section 88651 of the Education Code, relating to economic development. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 669, as introduced, Berman. Economic development: California Community Colleges Economic and Workforce Development Program.Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges Economic and Workforce Development Program. Existing law provides for the awarding of grants for this program, and provides that this program shall only be implemented during fiscal years for which funds are appropriated for these purposes. Existing law repeals the program on January 1, 2018.This bill would make the program inoperative on July 1, 2023, and make the repeal date for the program January 1, 2024, thereby extending the provisions governing the program until those dates.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 669

Introduced by Assembly Member BermanFebruary 14, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Berman
February 14, 2017

 An act to amend Section 88651 of the Education Code, relating to economic development. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 669, as introduced, Berman. Economic development: California Community Colleges Economic and Workforce Development Program.

Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges Economic and Workforce Development Program. Existing law provides for the awarding of grants for this program, and provides that this program shall only be implemented during fiscal years for which funds are appropriated for these purposes. Existing law repeals the program on January 1, 2018.This bill would make the program inoperative on July 1, 2023, and make the repeal date for the program January 1, 2024, thereby extending the provisions governing the program until those dates.

Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges Economic and Workforce Development Program. Existing law provides for the awarding of grants for this program, and provides that this program shall only be implemented during fiscal years for which funds are appropriated for these purposes. Existing law repeals the program on January 1, 2018.

This bill would make the program inoperative on July 1, 2023, and make the repeal date for the program January 1, 2024, thereby extending the provisions governing the program until those dates.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 88651 of the Education Code is amended to read:88651. This part shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, become inoperative on July 1, 2023, and as of that date January 1, 2024, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 88651 of the Education Code is amended to read:88651. This part shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, become inoperative on July 1, 2023, and as of that date January 1, 2024, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

SECTION 1. Section 88651 of the Education Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

88651. This part shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, become inoperative on July 1, 2023, and as of that date January 1, 2024, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

88651. This part shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, become inoperative on July 1, 2023, and as of that date January 1, 2024, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

88651. This part shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, become inoperative on July 1, 2023, and as of that date January 1, 2024, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2024, deletes or extends that date.



88651. This part shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, become inoperative on July 1, 2023, and as of that date January 1, 2024, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2024, deletes or extends that date.