Enrolled August 15, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly March 22, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 14, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 149Introduced by Assembly Member ChoiJanuary 09, 2018Relative to the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 149, Choi. Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of Interstate 5 in the City of Tustin as the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, On January 7, 1973, at 31 years of age, Tustin Police Department Officer Waldron G. Karp succumbed to gunshot wounds sustained one month earlier when he was shot while assisting Orange County Sheriffs Department deputies on a call involving a man with a rifle; andWHEREAS, Becoming a police officer was Karps dream job after he served in the United States Navy during the Vietnam War, and he served his community honorably; andWHEREAS, For his courage in the line of duty, Officer Karp was awarded the Medal of Valor by the Tustin Police Department in 2015, the highest honor awarded by the department; andWHEREAS, Officer Karp is the only Tustin Police Department officer to be killed in the line of duty, and the story of Officer Karps death has been passed from one generation of Tustin Police Department officers to the next; andWHEREAS, To commemorate Officer Karps service, the City of Tustin established the Wally Karp Memorial Ceremony, which honors and retells his story, and established the Wally Karp Memorial Scholarship, which is awarded to a local high school student; andWHEREAS, Waldron G. Karp is survived by his daughter, Sher Karp, and grandson, Jacob; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of Interstate 5 from northbound Tustin Ranch Road, approximately post mile 28.224, to southbound Tustin Ranch Road, approximately post mile R.28.456, in the City of Tustin as the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. Enrolled August 15, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly March 22, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 14, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 149Introduced by Assembly Member ChoiJanuary 09, 2018Relative to the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 149, Choi. Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of Interstate 5 in the City of Tustin as the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Enrolled August 15, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly March 22, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 14, 2018 Enrolled August 15, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly March 22, 2018 Amended IN Assembly March 14, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 149 Introduced by Assembly Member ChoiJanuary 09, 2018 Introduced by Assembly Member Choi January 09, 2018 Relative to the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 149, Choi. Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of Interstate 5 in the City of Tustin as the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs. This measure would designate a specified portion of Interstate 5 in the City of Tustin as the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, On January 7, 1973, at 31 years of age, Tustin Police Department Officer Waldron G. Karp succumbed to gunshot wounds sustained one month earlier when he was shot while assisting Orange County Sheriffs Department deputies on a call involving a man with a rifle; and WHEREAS, Becoming a police officer was Karps dream job after he served in the United States Navy during the Vietnam War, and he served his community honorably; and WHEREAS, For his courage in the line of duty, Officer Karp was awarded the Medal of Valor by the Tustin Police Department in 2015, the highest honor awarded by the department; and WHEREAS, Officer Karp is the only Tustin Police Department officer to be killed in the line of duty, and the story of Officer Karps death has been passed from one generation of Tustin Police Department officers to the next; and WHEREAS, To commemorate Officer Karps service, the City of Tustin established the Wally Karp Memorial Ceremony, which honors and retells his story, and established the Wally Karp Memorial Scholarship, which is awarded to a local high school student; and WHEREAS, Waldron G. Karp is survived by his daughter, Sher Karp, and grandson, Jacob; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of Interstate 5 from northbound Tustin Ranch Road, approximately post mile 28.224, to southbound Tustin Ranch Road, approximately post mile R.28.456, in the City of Tustin as the Officer and Medal of Valor Recipient Waldron G. Karp Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.