California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR150 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/24/2018

                    Enrolled  April 24, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  April 23, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  March 22, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  March 15, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 150Introduced by Assembly Member Limn(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chvez, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)January 09, 2018Relative to Dual Enrollment Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 150, Limn. Dual Enrollment Week.This measure would recognize the week of March 18, 2018, to March 24, 2018, inclusive, as Dual Enrollment Week in California and would encourage colleges and universities to visit high schools and take action to help pupils register in dual enrollment courses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Dual enrollment programs offer pupils the opportunity to take challenging college courses while still enrolled in high school; andWHEREAS, Successful completion of and satisfactory performance in a dual enrollment course awards pupils college credit at colleges and universities worldwide, representing a substantial savings in college tuition for students and parents; andWHEREAS, Bringing awareness to dual enrollment programs can provide pathways to higher education for all pupils, especially those from underrepresented communities; andWHEREAS, Challenging dual enrollment courses significantly contribute toward building a globally competitive, career-ready workforce in California; and WHEREAS, The State Department of Education, school districts, the California Community Colleges, the California State University, the University of California, and nonprofit college access organizations that administer or facilitate the participation in dual enrollment programs have had a long-standing partnership to build participation in dual enrollment in California; andWHEREAS, In the 201516 fall, winter, spring, and summer terms, there was a total enrollment of 158,403 high school pupils in California Community Colleges; andWHEREAS, The above figure represents continued growth in the number of public school pupils taking dual enrollment courses in California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes the week of March 18, 2018, to March 24, 2018, inclusive, as Dual Enrollment Week in California; and be it further Resolved, That colleges and universities are encouraged to visit high schools and take action to help pupils register in dual enrollment courses; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  April 24, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  April 23, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  March 22, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  March 15, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 150Introduced by Assembly Member Limn(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chvez, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)January 09, 2018Relative to Dual Enrollment Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 150, Limn. Dual Enrollment Week.This measure would recognize the week of March 18, 2018, to March 24, 2018, inclusive, as Dual Enrollment Week in California and would encourage colleges and universities to visit high schools and take action to help pupils register in dual enrollment courses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  April 24, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  April 23, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  March 22, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  March 15, 2018

Enrolled  April 24, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  April 23, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  March 22, 2018
Amended IN  Assembly  March 15, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 150

Introduced by Assembly Member Limn(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chvez, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)January 09, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Limn(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chvez, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)
January 09, 2018

Relative to Dual Enrollment Week. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 150, Limn. Dual Enrollment Week.

This measure would recognize the week of March 18, 2018, to March 24, 2018, inclusive, as Dual Enrollment Week in California and would encourage colleges and universities to visit high schools and take action to help pupils register in dual enrollment courses.

This measure would recognize the week of March 18, 2018, to March 24, 2018, inclusive, as Dual Enrollment Week in California and would encourage colleges and universities to visit high schools and take action to help pupils register in dual enrollment courses.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Dual enrollment programs offer pupils the opportunity to take challenging college courses while still enrolled in high school; and

WHEREAS, Successful completion of and satisfactory performance in a dual enrollment course awards pupils college credit at colleges and universities worldwide, representing a substantial savings in college tuition for students and parents; and

WHEREAS, Bringing awareness to dual enrollment programs can provide pathways to higher education for all pupils, especially those from underrepresented communities; and

WHEREAS, Challenging dual enrollment courses significantly contribute toward building a globally competitive, career-ready workforce in California; and 

WHEREAS, The State Department of Education, school districts, the California Community Colleges, the California State University, the University of California, and nonprofit college access organizations that administer or facilitate the participation in dual enrollment programs have had a long-standing partnership to build participation in dual enrollment in California; and

WHEREAS, In the 201516 fall, winter, spring, and summer terms, there was a total enrollment of 158,403 high school pupils in California Community Colleges; and

WHEREAS, The above figure represents continued growth in the number of public school pupils taking dual enrollment courses in California; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes the week of March 18, 2018, to March 24, 2018, inclusive, as Dual Enrollment Week in California; and be it further 

Resolved, That colleges and universities are encouraged to visit high schools and take action to help pupils register in dual enrollment courses; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.