California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR153 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/22/2018

                    Enrolled  May 22, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  May 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  April 12, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 02, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  January 16, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 153Introduced by Assembly Member SantiagoJanuary 11, 2018Relative to pet adoptions.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 153, Santiago. Pet adoptions.This measure would urge communities in California to implement policies aimed at saving the lives of all healthy and adoptable cats and dogs by 2025.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In 1998, the State of California enacted a policy that no adoptable animal should be euthanized if it can be adopted into a suitable home and that no treatable animal should be euthanized; andWHEREAS, The number of dogs and cats leaving California animal shelters alive has increased significantly over the past decade; andWHEREAS, Each year, an estimated two million healthy and adoptable cats and dogs nationwide do not leave animal shelters; andWHEREAS, Hundreds of thousands of dogs, puppies, cats, and kittens have entered California animal shelters, but not all have found forever homes; andWHEREAS, Handling animals in shelters costs California taxpayers tens of millions of dollars each year; andWHEREAS, A national survey revealed that almost 70 percent of citizens do not want unowned kittens or cats picked up and killed; andWHEREAS, California is home to innovative leaders in shelter animal welfare that have invested heavily in developing cost-effective, life-saving strategies to reduce the intake of animals at shelters and to handle and place animals humanely; andWHEREAS, Many leading California animal shelters have implemented new and innovative programs and policies to ensure healthy outcomes for homeless cats and dogs; andWHEREAS, Those policies and programs include volunteer foster care networks; comprehensive adoption programs; medical and behavioral programs; public education and awareness programs; trap, neuter, vaccinate, and return or release programs; animal socialization programs; and many others; andWHEREAS, Many local governments, nonprofit organizations, business entities, and other entities continue to invest significant efforts in improving resources, training, and opportunities for animal shelters across California so that every community in the state can make progress toward the states 20-year-old commitment to save all adoptable or treatable animals; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That communities in California are urged to implement policies aimed at saving the lives of all healthy and adoptable cats and dogs by 2025; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly shall transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  May 22, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  May 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  April 12, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 02, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  January 16, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 153Introduced by Assembly Member SantiagoJanuary 11, 2018Relative to pet adoptions.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 153, Santiago. Pet adoptions.This measure would urge communities in California to implement policies aimed at saving the lives of all healthy and adoptable cats and dogs by 2025.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  May 22, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  May 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  April 12, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  April 02, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  January 16, 2018

Enrolled  May 22, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  May 21, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  April 12, 2018
Amended IN  Assembly  April 02, 2018
Amended IN  Assembly  January 16, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 153

Introduced by Assembly Member SantiagoJanuary 11, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Santiago
January 11, 2018

Relative to pet adoptions.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 153, Santiago. Pet adoptions.

This measure would urge communities in California to implement policies aimed at saving the lives of all healthy and adoptable cats and dogs by 2025.

This measure would urge communities in California to implement policies aimed at saving the lives of all healthy and adoptable cats and dogs by 2025.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, In 1998, the State of California enacted a policy that no adoptable animal should be euthanized if it can be adopted into a suitable home and that no treatable animal should be euthanized; and

WHEREAS, The number of dogs and cats leaving California animal shelters alive has increased significantly over the past decade; and

WHEREAS, Each year, an estimated two million healthy and adoptable cats and dogs nationwide do not leave animal shelters; and

WHEREAS, Hundreds of thousands of dogs, puppies, cats, and kittens have entered California animal shelters, but not all have found forever homes; and

WHEREAS, Handling animals in shelters costs California taxpayers tens of millions of dollars each year; and

WHEREAS, A national survey revealed that almost 70 percent of citizens do not want unowned kittens or cats picked up and killed; and

WHEREAS, California is home to innovative leaders in shelter animal welfare that have invested heavily in developing cost-effective, life-saving strategies to reduce the intake of animals at shelters and to handle and place animals humanely; and

WHEREAS, Many leading California animal shelters have implemented new and innovative programs and policies to ensure healthy outcomes for homeless cats and dogs; and

WHEREAS, Those policies and programs include volunteer foster care networks; comprehensive adoption programs; medical and behavioral programs; public education and awareness programs; trap, neuter, vaccinate, and return or release programs; animal socialization programs; and many others; and

WHEREAS, Many local governments, nonprofit organizations, business entities, and other entities continue to invest significant efforts in improving resources, training, and opportunities for animal shelters across California so that every community in the state can make progress toward the states 20-year-old commitment to save all adoptable or treatable animals; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That communities in California are urged to implement policies aimed at saving the lives of all healthy and adoptable cats and dogs by 2025; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly shall transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.