California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR212 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/15/2018

                    Enrolled  August 15, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 14, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 212Introduced by Assembly Member Kiley(Coauthors: Assembly Members Cooley and Cooper)(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)April 03, 2018 Relative to the Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 212, Kiley. Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 50 in the County of El Dorado as the Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Sacramento County Deputy Sheriff, Robert "Bobby" French, who was born on January 29, 1965, was killed in the line of duty on August 30, 2017; andWHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French was a 21-year veteran of the Sacramento County Sheriffs Department and was a training officer with the north area patrol division. He was well respected and he was someone deputies would go to for advice and counsel according to Sheriff Scott Jones; andWHEREAS, Even at 52 years of age and with 21 years on the force, Deputy Sheriff French still loved the daily routines of being a cop: putting on the uniform, talking to community members, and driving his patrol car around the vast suburban landscape north of the American River; andWHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French was a patrol deputy since 2000 and a training officer who mentored new deputies. On his days off, he also worked as a school resource officer for the San Juan Unified School District; andWHEREAS, An avid lover of the game of football and the Dallas Cowboys, Deputy Sheriff French also spent much of his free time boating with his friends and family on Folsom Lake; andWHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French was a southern gentleman, a man of great integrity with a smile and laugh that welcomed anyone in a room, who loved his life, his family, and his work; andWHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French is survived by his daughter Kaylen Bynoe, her husband Joe Bynoe, their daughter Evelyn, his son Nick French, and his sons wife Heather French, their two kids, Marley (girl) and Dallas (boy), his son Kosai French, his sister Lori Mitchell and her husband, Matt Mitchell, and their two sons Landon and Brooks; andWHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French was a resident of El Dorado Hills where he resided with his longtime girlfriend, Kara Merino and her two children, Olivia and Andrew; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 50 in the County of El Dorado from (PM .01) to the Latrobe Road Under Crossing (PM .857) as the Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 15, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 14, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 212Introduced by Assembly Member Kiley(Coauthors: Assembly Members Cooley and Cooper)(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)April 03, 2018 Relative to the Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 212, Kiley. Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 50 in the County of El Dorado as the Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES 

 Enrolled  August 15, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 14, 2018

Enrolled  August 15, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  June 14, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 212

Introduced by Assembly Member Kiley(Coauthors: Assembly Members Cooley and Cooper)(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)April 03, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Kiley(Coauthors: Assembly Members Cooley and Cooper)(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)
April 03, 2018

 Relative to the Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 212, Kiley. Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway.

This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 50 in the County of El Dorado as the Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 50 in the County of El Dorado as the Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Sacramento County Deputy Sheriff, Robert "Bobby" French, who was born on January 29, 1965, was killed in the line of duty on August 30, 2017; and

WHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French was a 21-year veteran of the Sacramento County Sheriffs Department and was a training officer with the north area patrol division. He was well respected and he was someone deputies would go to for advice and counsel according to Sheriff Scott Jones; and

WHEREAS, Even at 52 years of age and with 21 years on the force, Deputy Sheriff French still loved the daily routines of being a cop: putting on the uniform, talking to community members, and driving his patrol car around the vast suburban landscape north of the American River; and

WHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French was a patrol deputy since 2000 and a training officer who mentored new deputies. On his days off, he also worked as a school resource officer for the San Juan Unified School District; and

WHEREAS, An avid lover of the game of football and the Dallas Cowboys, Deputy Sheriff French also spent much of his free time boating with his friends and family on Folsom Lake; and

WHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French was a southern gentleman, a man of great integrity with a smile and laugh that welcomed anyone in a room, who loved his life, his family, and his work; and

WHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French is survived by his daughter Kaylen Bynoe, her husband Joe Bynoe, their daughter Evelyn, his son Nick French, and his sons wife Heather French, their two kids, Marley (girl) and Dallas (boy), his son Kosai French, his sister Lori Mitchell and her husband, Matt Mitchell, and their two sons Landon and Brooks; and

WHEREAS, Deputy Sheriff French was a resident of El Dorado Hills where he resided with his longtime girlfriend, Kara Merino and her two children, Olivia and Andrew; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 50 in the County of El Dorado from (PM .01) to the Latrobe Road Under Crossing (PM .857) as the Deputy Sheriff Robert Bobby French Memorial Highway; and be it further

Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.