California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR225 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/22/2018

                    Enrolled  June 22, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 04, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 225Introduced by Assembly Member Choi(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Flora, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)April 24, 2018 Relative to Secure Your Load Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 225, Choi. Secure Your Load Day.This measure would declare June 6, 2018, as Secure Your Load Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The State of California is the nations most populous state with 38.8 million residents and growing; andWHEREAS, Traffic in California has become more congested in recent years, resulting in an increase in road debris and automobile collisions; and WHEREAS, Ethan Hawks, a 17-year-old senior and football star from Whittier Christian High School, was a victim of a tragic accident in the County of Orange caused by a heavy piece of metal escaping from another vehicle and striking the car that he was riding in, ultimately taking his life; andWHEREAS, All residents of California should recognize the dangers of driving, and be accountable for their habits while in a vehicle; andWHEREAS, Section 23114 of the Vehicle Code prohibits a vehicle from being driven on a highway unless it is constructed, covered, or loaded so as to prevent any of its contents or load from escaping from the vehicle; andWHEREAS, The commonsense, routine act of securing every load protects the lives of California residents, and this precaution must not be overlooked; and WHEREAS, The State of California recognizes and honors the profound suffering of those harmed by unsecured loads; and WHEREAS, The State of California stands in solidarity with persons impacted by those instances of avoidable incidents caused by unsecured loads; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares June 6, 2018, as Secure Your Load Day in California to increase public awareness of the necessity of securing loads on vehicles using the states highways; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Motor Vehicles and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  June 22, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 04, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 225Introduced by Assembly Member Choi(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Flora, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)April 24, 2018 Relative to Secure Your Load Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 225, Choi. Secure Your Load Day.This measure would declare June 6, 2018, as Secure Your Load Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  June 22, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 04, 2018

Enrolled  June 22, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  June 21, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  June 04, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 225

Introduced by Assembly Member Choi(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Flora, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)April 24, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Choi(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Flora, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)
April 24, 2018

 Relative to Secure Your Load Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 225, Choi. Secure Your Load Day.

This measure would declare June 6, 2018, as Secure Your Load Day in California.

This measure would declare June 6, 2018, as Secure Your Load Day in California.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The State of California is the nations most populous state with 38.8 million residents and growing; and

WHEREAS, Traffic in California has become more congested in recent years, resulting in an increase in road debris and automobile collisions; and 

WHEREAS, Ethan Hawks, a 17-year-old senior and football star from Whittier Christian High School, was a victim of a tragic accident in the County of Orange caused by a heavy piece of metal escaping from another vehicle and striking the car that he was riding in, ultimately taking his life; and

WHEREAS, All residents of California should recognize the dangers of driving, and be accountable for their habits while in a vehicle; and

WHEREAS, Section 23114 of the Vehicle Code prohibits a vehicle from being driven on a highway unless it is constructed, covered, or loaded so as to prevent any of its contents or load from escaping from the vehicle; and

WHEREAS, The commonsense, routine act of securing every load protects the lives of California residents, and this precaution must not be overlooked; and 

WHEREAS, The State of California recognizes and honors the profound suffering of those harmed by unsecured loads; and 

WHEREAS, The State of California stands in solidarity with persons impacted by those instances of avoidable incidents caused by unsecured loads; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares June 6, 2018, as Secure Your Load Day in California to increase public awareness of the necessity of securing loads on vehicles using the states highways; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Motor Vehicles and to the author for appropriate distribution.