California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR245 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/29/2018

                    Enrolled  August 29, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 04, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 245Introduced by Assembly Member Acosta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Baker, Bigelow, Brough, Calderon, Cervantes, Chvez, Chen, Choi, Cooley, Flora, Gallagher, Gray, Harper, Irwin, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Salas, Voepel, and Waldron)(Coauthor: Senator Wilk)May 29, 2018Relative to Ronald Reagan Day.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 245, Acosta. Ronald Reagan Day. This measure would declare June 5, 2018, as Ronald Reagan Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, President Ronald Wilson Reagan, a man of humble background, worked throughout his life serving freedom and advancing the public good, having been employed as an entertainer, union leader, corporate spokesman, Governor of California, and President of the United States; andWHEREAS, Ronald Reagan is the only person in Californias 166-year history to be elected to the offices of both Governor of the State of California and President of the United States; andWHEREAS, Ronald Reagan served with honor and distinction for two terms as the 40th President of the United States of America, in the second of which he earned the confidence of three-fifths of the electorate in 1984, emerging victorious in 49 of the 50 states in the general electiona record unsurpassed in the history of American presidential elections; andWHEREAS, In 1981, when Ronald Reagan was inaugurated President, he inherited a disillusioned nation shackled by rampant inflation and high unemployment; andWHEREAS, President Reagans commitment to the nations children helped lower crime and drug use in our neighborhoods; andWHEREAS, President Reagans commitment to our Armed Forces contributed to the restoration of pride in America, her values, and those cherished by the free world, and prepared Americas Armed Forces to meet 21st century challenges; andWHEREAS, President Reagans vision of peace through strength led to the end of the Cold War; andWHEREAS, In 1987, President Reagan gave a speech at the Berlin Wall where he famously told Soviet leader Mikhail Gorbachev to tear down this wall, which became reality in 1989; andWHEREAS, June 5, 2018, will be the 14th anniversary of Ronald Reagans death; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature takes great pride in honoring Ronald Reagan for his many contributions to our country and in celebrating his life; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature recognizes June 5, 2018, as Ronald Reagan Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 29, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 04, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 245Introduced by Assembly Member Acosta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Baker, Bigelow, Brough, Calderon, Cervantes, Chvez, Chen, Choi, Cooley, Flora, Gallagher, Gray, Harper, Irwin, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Salas, Voepel, and Waldron)(Coauthor: Senator Wilk)May 29, 2018Relative to Ronald Reagan Day.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 245, Acosta. Ronald Reagan Day. This measure would declare June 5, 2018, as Ronald Reagan Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  August 29, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 04, 2018

Enrolled  August 29, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  June 04, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 245

Introduced by Assembly Member Acosta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Baker, Bigelow, Brough, Calderon, Cervantes, Chvez, Chen, Choi, Cooley, Flora, Gallagher, Gray, Harper, Irwin, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Salas, Voepel, and Waldron)(Coauthor: Senator Wilk)May 29, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Acosta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Baker, Bigelow, Brough, Calderon, Cervantes, Chvez, Chen, Choi, Cooley, Flora, Gallagher, Gray, Harper, Irwin, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Melendez, Muratsuchi, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Salas, Voepel, and Waldron)(Coauthor: Senator Wilk)
May 29, 2018

Relative to Ronald Reagan Day.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 245, Acosta. Ronald Reagan Day. 

This measure would declare June 5, 2018, as Ronald Reagan Day.

This measure would declare June 5, 2018, as Ronald Reagan Day.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, President Ronald Wilson Reagan, a man of humble background, worked throughout his life serving freedom and advancing the public good, having been employed as an entertainer, union leader, corporate spokesman, Governor of California, and President of the United States; and

WHEREAS, Ronald Reagan is the only person in Californias 166-year history to be elected to the offices of both Governor of the State of California and President of the United States; and

WHEREAS, Ronald Reagan served with honor and distinction for two terms as the 40th President of the United States of America, in the second of which he earned the confidence of three-fifths of the electorate in 1984, emerging victorious in 49 of the 50 states in the general electiona record unsurpassed in the history of American presidential elections; and

WHEREAS, In 1981, when Ronald Reagan was inaugurated President, he inherited a disillusioned nation shackled by rampant inflation and high unemployment; and

WHEREAS, President Reagans commitment to the nations children helped lower crime and drug use in our neighborhoods; and

WHEREAS, President Reagans commitment to our Armed Forces contributed to the restoration of pride in America, her values, and those cherished by the free world, and prepared Americas Armed Forces to meet 21st century challenges; and

WHEREAS, President Reagans vision of peace through strength led to the end of the Cold War; and

WHEREAS, In 1987, President Reagan gave a speech at the Berlin Wall where he famously told Soviet leader Mikhail Gorbachev to tear down this wall, which became reality in 1989; and

WHEREAS, June 5, 2018, will be the 14th anniversary of Ronald Reagans death; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature takes great pride in honoring Ronald Reagan for his many contributions to our country and in celebrating his life; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes June 5, 2018, as Ronald Reagan Day; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.