California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR249 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/15/2018

                    Enrolled  August 15, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 18, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 249Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Travis Allen, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rivas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)June 04, 2018 Relative to Fathers Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 249, Gallagher. Fathers Day.This measure would recognize June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day and would commend fathers and father figures present in their childrens lives.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For the past 100 years, the United States has recognized the contributions of fathers through the celebration of Fathers Day on the third Sunday in June; andWHEREAS, Fathers help provide the economic and emotional stability needed for children to succeed in life; andWHEREAS, Involved fathers help provide financial and in-home support for their families, which leads to better economic outcomes for their children; andWHEREAS, Children who have involved parents are less likely to become homeless, and have higher IQ scores at age three; andWHEREAS, Studies have shown that children whose fathers are involved have a decreased likelihood of becoming obese at a young age; andWHEREAS, Infants of involved fathers have positive cognitive and developmental outcomes, including improved weight gain and improved breastfeeding rates; andWHEREAS, Involved fathers contribute to higher linguistic abilities and academic achievement in their children; andWHEREAS, Fathers are a much needed source of social and emotional support, and reduce the risk of childhood depression in their children; andWHEREAS, Fathers provide structure for adulthood, for productive statesmanship, and for the skills to contribute to the well-being of ones neighbor and the global market; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day, and commends fathers and father figures who are present in their childrens lives; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature honors men that selflessly take up their responsibilities for the full development and maturation of their children; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature recognizes Fathers Day as an important day to reflect on the positive contributions of involved fathers and to celebrate fathers in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 15, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 18, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 249Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Travis Allen, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rivas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)June 04, 2018 Relative to Fathers Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 249, Gallagher. Fathers Day.This measure would recognize June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day and would commend fathers and father figures present in their childrens lives.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  August 15, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  June 18, 2018

Enrolled  August 15, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  June 18, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 249

Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Travis Allen, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rivas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)June 04, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Travis Allen, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rivas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)
June 04, 2018

 Relative to Fathers Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 249, Gallagher. Fathers Day.

This measure would recognize June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day and would commend fathers and father figures present in their childrens lives.

This measure would recognize June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day and would commend fathers and father figures present in their childrens lives.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, For the past 100 years, the United States has recognized the contributions of fathers through the celebration of Fathers Day on the third Sunday in June; and

WHEREAS, Fathers help provide the economic and emotional stability needed for children to succeed in life; and

WHEREAS, Involved fathers help provide financial and in-home support for their families, which leads to better economic outcomes for their children; and

WHEREAS, Children who have involved parents are less likely to become homeless, and have higher IQ scores at age three; and

WHEREAS, Studies have shown that children whose fathers are involved have a decreased likelihood of becoming obese at a young age; and

WHEREAS, Infants of involved fathers have positive cognitive and developmental outcomes, including improved weight gain and improved breastfeeding rates; and

WHEREAS, Involved fathers contribute to higher linguistic abilities and academic achievement in their children; and

WHEREAS, Fathers are a much needed source of social and emotional support, and reduce the risk of childhood depression in their children; and

WHEREAS, Fathers provide structure for adulthood, for productive statesmanship, and for the skills to contribute to the well-being of ones neighbor and the global market; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day, and commends fathers and father figures who are present in their childrens lives; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature honors men that selflessly take up their responsibilities for the full development and maturation of their children; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes Fathers Day as an important day to reflect on the positive contributions of involved fathers and to celebrate fathers in California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.