Enrolled May 02, 2017 Passed IN Senate May 01, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 06, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 41Introduced by Assembly Member Bonta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Patterson, Quirk, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)March 22, 2017Relative to Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 41, Bonta. Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day.This measure designates April 9, 2017, and every April 9 thereafter, as Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Commencing on April 9, 1942, during World War II, the Japanese Army forced 78,000 Filipino and American soldiers to march 82 miles from Bataan to Camp ODonnell; and WHEREAS, These soldiers endured brutal conditions and suffered heinous war crimes along the march; and WHEREAS, Approximately 10,000 soldiers, both Filipino and American, lost their lives during the march; and WHEREAS, The Bataan Death March was the greatest loss of American and Filipino prisoners of war during World War II; and WHEREAS, Many survivors were forced to labor in prison camps in the Philippines and Japan while prisoners of war; and WHEREAS, Californians owe a debt of gratitude to the soldiers who gave up their freedom and perished in service of their countries to preserve our freedoms and our lives; and WHEREAS, Knowledge of this historic event is passing out of living memory as survivors pass away; and WHEREAS, The sacrifices made by American and Filipino veterans during the Bataan Death March have received little state recognition in California; and WHEREAS, The federal Government annually recognizes April 9th as National Former Prisoner of War Day; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares that a day be set aside for appreciation of the veterans of the Bataan Death March and a memoriam of the deceased; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature hereby designates and commemorates April 9, 2017, and each April 9th thereafter, as Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Enrolled May 02, 2017 Passed IN Senate May 01, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 06, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 41Introduced by Assembly Member Bonta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Patterson, Quirk, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)March 22, 2017Relative to Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 41, Bonta. Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day.This measure designates April 9, 2017, and every April 9 thereafter, as Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Enrolled May 02, 2017 Passed IN Senate May 01, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 06, 2017 Enrolled May 02, 2017 Passed IN Senate May 01, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 06, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 41 Introduced by Assembly Member Bonta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Patterson, Quirk, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)March 22, 2017 Introduced by Assembly Member Bonta(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Patterson, Quirk, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood) March 22, 2017 Relative to Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 41, Bonta. Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day. This measure designates April 9, 2017, and every April 9 thereafter, as Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day. This measure designates April 9, 2017, and every April 9 thereafter, as Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, Commencing on April 9, 1942, during World War II, the Japanese Army forced 78,000 Filipino and American soldiers to march 82 miles from Bataan to Camp ODonnell; and WHEREAS, These soldiers endured brutal conditions and suffered heinous war crimes along the march; and WHEREAS, Approximately 10,000 soldiers, both Filipino and American, lost their lives during the march; and WHEREAS, The Bataan Death March was the greatest loss of American and Filipino prisoners of war during World War II; and WHEREAS, Many survivors were forced to labor in prison camps in the Philippines and Japan while prisoners of war; and WHEREAS, Californians owe a debt of gratitude to the soldiers who gave up their freedom and perished in service of their countries to preserve our freedoms and our lives; and WHEREAS, Knowledge of this historic event is passing out of living memory as survivors pass away; and WHEREAS, The sacrifices made by American and Filipino veterans during the Bataan Death March have received little state recognition in California; and WHEREAS, The federal Government annually recognizes April 9th as National Former Prisoner of War Day; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares that a day be set aside for appreciation of the veterans of the Bataan Death March and a memoriam of the deceased; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature hereby designates and commemorates April 9, 2017, and each April 9th thereafter, as Bataan Death March Veterans Commemoration Day; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.