California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR55 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/01/2017

                    Enrolled  June 01, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  May 30, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 15, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 55Introduced by Assembly Member Baker(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gomez, Grayson, Harper, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)April 17, 2017 Relative to Food Allergy Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 55, Baker. Food Allergy Awareness Week.This measure would declare the week of May 14 to May 20, 2017, as Food Allergy Awareness Week and encourage Californians to increase their understanding and awareness of food allergies and anaphylaxis.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, As many as 15 million people in the United States have a food allergy; andWHEREAS, Research indicates the prevalence of food allergies is increasing among children. Nearly six million children under 18 years of age have a food allergy; andWHEREAS, The eight foods that cause the majority of all food allergy reactions in the United States are shellfish, fish, milk, eggs, tree nuts, peanuts, soy, and wheat; andWHEREAS, Symptoms of a food-allergic reaction can include hives, vomiting, diarrhea, respiratory distress, and swelling of the throat; andWHEREAS, Anaphylaxis is a serious allergic reaction that is rapid in onset and may cause death; andWHEREAS, According to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, food allergies result in more than 200,000 ambulatory care visits a year involving children under 18 years of age. Reactions typically occur when an individual unknowingly eats a food containing an ingredient to which he or she is allergic; andWHEREAS, There is no cure for a food allergy, and scientists do not understand why that is. Strict avoidance of the offending food is the only way to prevent an allergic reaction; andWHEREAS, Food Allergy Research and Education (FARE) is a national, nonprofit organization dedicated to improving the quality of life and the health of individuals with food allergies and to providing them with hope through the promise of new treatments; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That May 14 to May 20, 2017, is hereby proclaimed Food Allergy Awareness Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages the residents of this state to increase their understanding and awareness of food allergies and anaphylaxis by visiting www.foodallergyweek.org; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  June 01, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  May 30, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 15, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 55Introduced by Assembly Member Baker(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gomez, Grayson, Harper, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)April 17, 2017 Relative to Food Allergy Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 55, Baker. Food Allergy Awareness Week.This measure would declare the week of May 14 to May 20, 2017, as Food Allergy Awareness Week and encourage Californians to increase their understanding and awareness of food allergies and anaphylaxis.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  June 01, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  May 30, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 15, 2017

Enrolled  June 01, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  May 30, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  May 15, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 55

Introduced by Assembly Member Baker(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gomez, Grayson, Harper, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)April 17, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Baker(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gomez, Grayson, Harper, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)
April 17, 2017

 Relative to Food Allergy Awareness Week. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 55, Baker. Food Allergy Awareness Week.

This measure would declare the week of May 14 to May 20, 2017, as Food Allergy Awareness Week and encourage Californians to increase their understanding and awareness of food allergies and anaphylaxis.

This measure would declare the week of May 14 to May 20, 2017, as Food Allergy Awareness Week and encourage Californians to increase their understanding and awareness of food allergies and anaphylaxis.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, As many as 15 million people in the United States have a food allergy; and

WHEREAS, Research indicates the prevalence of food allergies is increasing among children. Nearly six million children under 18 years of age have a food allergy; and

WHEREAS, The eight foods that cause the majority of all food allergy reactions in the United States are shellfish, fish, milk, eggs, tree nuts, peanuts, soy, and wheat; and

WHEREAS, Symptoms of a food-allergic reaction can include hives, vomiting, diarrhea, respiratory distress, and swelling of the throat; and

WHEREAS, Anaphylaxis is a serious allergic reaction that is rapid in onset and may cause death; and

WHEREAS, According to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, food allergies result in more than 200,000 ambulatory care visits a year involving children under 18 years of age. Reactions typically occur when an individual unknowingly eats a food containing an ingredient to which he or she is allergic; and

WHEREAS, There is no cure for a food allergy, and scientists do not understand why that is. Strict avoidance of the offending food is the only way to prevent an allergic reaction; and

WHEREAS, Food Allergy Research and Education (FARE) is a national, nonprofit organization dedicated to improving the quality of life and the health of individuals with food allergies and to providing them with hope through the promise of new treatments; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That May 14 to May 20, 2017, is hereby proclaimed Food Allergy Awareness Week; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature encourages the residents of this state to increase their understanding and awareness of food allergies and anaphylaxis by visiting www.foodallergyweek.org; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.