California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1181 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/07/2018

                    Enrolled  September 07, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  May 31, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1181Introduced by Senator Hueso(Coauthor: Assembly Member Gonzalez Fletcher)February 14, 2018 An act to add Section 8585.8 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1181, Hueso. Emergency services: certified community conservation corps.Existing law, the California Emergency Services Act, grants the Governor certain powers to be exercised in accordance with the State Emergency Plan and programs for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency. Existing law creates the Office of Emergency Services within the Governors office and commits to the office the responsibility for the states response services for natural, technological, or manmade disasters and emergencies.This bill would authorize the Office of Emergency Services to enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps, as defined, to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 8585.8 is added to the Government Code, to read:8585.8. (a) The office may enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate. (b) For purposes of this subdivision, certified community conservation corps means a community conservation corps that has been certified as described in Section 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code. 

 Enrolled  September 07, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  May 31, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1181Introduced by Senator Hueso(Coauthor: Assembly Member Gonzalez Fletcher)February 14, 2018 An act to add Section 8585.8 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1181, Hueso. Emergency services: certified community conservation corps.Existing law, the California Emergency Services Act, grants the Governor certain powers to be exercised in accordance with the State Emergency Plan and programs for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency. Existing law creates the Office of Emergency Services within the Governors office and commits to the office the responsibility for the states response services for natural, technological, or manmade disasters and emergencies.This bill would authorize the Office of Emergency Services to enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps, as defined, to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 07, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  May 31, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2018

Enrolled  September 07, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  May 31, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Bill No. 1181

Introduced by Senator Hueso(Coauthor: Assembly Member Gonzalez Fletcher)February 14, 2018

Introduced by Senator Hueso(Coauthor: Assembly Member Gonzalez Fletcher)
February 14, 2018

 An act to add Section 8585.8 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 1181, Hueso. Emergency services: certified community conservation corps.

Existing law, the California Emergency Services Act, grants the Governor certain powers to be exercised in accordance with the State Emergency Plan and programs for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency. Existing law creates the Office of Emergency Services within the Governors office and commits to the office the responsibility for the states response services for natural, technological, or manmade disasters and emergencies.This bill would authorize the Office of Emergency Services to enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps, as defined, to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate.

Existing law, the California Emergency Services Act, grants the Governor certain powers to be exercised in accordance with the State Emergency Plan and programs for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency. Existing law creates the Office of Emergency Services within the Governors office and commits to the office the responsibility for the states response services for natural, technological, or manmade disasters and emergencies.

This bill would authorize the Office of Emergency Services to enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps, as defined, to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 8585.8 is added to the Government Code, to read:8585.8. (a) The office may enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate. (b) For purposes of this subdivision, certified community conservation corps means a community conservation corps that has been certified as described in Section 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code. 

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 8585.8 is added to the Government Code, to read:8585.8. (a) The office may enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate. (b) For purposes of this subdivision, certified community conservation corps means a community conservation corps that has been certified as described in Section 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code. 

SECTION 1. Section 8585.8 is added to the Government Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

8585.8. (a) The office may enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate. (b) For purposes of this subdivision, certified community conservation corps means a community conservation corps that has been certified as described in Section 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code. 

8585.8. (a) The office may enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate. (b) For purposes of this subdivision, certified community conservation corps means a community conservation corps that has been certified as described in Section 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code. 

8585.8. (a) The office may enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate. (b) For purposes of this subdivision, certified community conservation corps means a community conservation corps that has been certified as described in Section 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code. 



8585.8. (a) The office may enter into an agreement directly with one or more certified community conservation corps to perform emergency or disaster response services as the office deems appropriate. 

(b) For purposes of this subdivision, certified community conservation corps means a community conservation corps that has been certified as described in Section 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code.