California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB330 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/01/2017

                    Enrolled  September 01, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  August 31, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  July 03, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  April 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 330Introduced by Senator BerryhillFebruary 13, 2017 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.

 Enrolled  September 01, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  August 31, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  July 03, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  April 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 330Introduced by Senator BerryhillFebruary 13, 2017 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver. The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 01, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  August 31, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  July 03, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  April 18, 2017

Enrolled  September 01, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  August 31, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  July 03, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  April 18, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Bill No. 330

Introduced by Senator BerryhillFebruary 13, 2017

Introduced by Senator Berryhill
February 13, 2017

 An act to add Section 17951.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 330, Berryhill. Building permit fees: waiver.

 The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.

 The State Housing Law authorizes cities and counties to prescribe fees for permits required or authorized pursuant to the State Housing Law. 

This bill would authorize these entities to waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.

SECTION 1. Section 17951.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.

17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.

17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.



17951.5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 17951, each city, county, or city and county may waive or reduce all building permit fees for improvements to the home of a veteran with a qualifying disability that are made to accommodate that disability.

(b) Qualifying disability means a disability that is recognized as service connected by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.