California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB511 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/13/2017

                    Enrolled  September 13, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  May 04, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 11, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  March 28, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 511Introduced by Senator Stern(Coauthor: Assembly Member Mullin)February 16, 2017 An act to amend Section 10 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 511, Stern. Elections: Secretary of State.Existing law declares that the Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state and that he or she has prescribed powers and duties.This bill would clarify the scope of those powers and duties and would require the Secretary of State to make reasonable efforts to promote voter registration and voting, as specified, especially in underrepresented communities.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 10 of the Elections Code is amended to read:10. (a) The Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state, and has the powers and duties specified in this code and Section 12172.5 of the Government Code.(b) (1) The Secretary of State shall make reasonable efforts to do all of the following:(A) Promote voter registration to eligible voters.(B) Encourage eligible voters to vote.(C) Promote pre-registration to eligible citizens.(D) Promote civic learning and engagement to prepare students and new citizens to register to vote and to vote.(2) In undertaking these efforts, the Secretary of State shall prioritize communities that have been historically underrepresented in voter registration or voting.

 Enrolled  September 13, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  May 04, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 11, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  March 28, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 511Introduced by Senator Stern(Coauthor: Assembly Member Mullin)February 16, 2017 An act to amend Section 10 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 511, Stern. Elections: Secretary of State.Existing law declares that the Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state and that he or she has prescribed powers and duties.This bill would clarify the scope of those powers and duties and would require the Secretary of State to make reasonable efforts to promote voter registration and voting, as specified, especially in underrepresented communities.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 13, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  May 04, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 11, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  March 28, 2017

Enrolled  September 13, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  May 04, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  September 11, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  March 28, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Bill No. 511

Introduced by Senator Stern(Coauthor: Assembly Member Mullin)February 16, 2017

Introduced by Senator Stern(Coauthor: Assembly Member Mullin)
February 16, 2017

 An act to amend Section 10 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 511, Stern. Elections: Secretary of State.

Existing law declares that the Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state and that he or she has prescribed powers and duties.This bill would clarify the scope of those powers and duties and would require the Secretary of State to make reasonable efforts to promote voter registration and voting, as specified, especially in underrepresented communities.

Existing law declares that the Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state and that he or she has prescribed powers and duties.

This bill would clarify the scope of those powers and duties and would require the Secretary of State to make reasonable efforts to promote voter registration and voting, as specified, especially in underrepresented communities.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 10 of the Elections Code is amended to read:10. (a) The Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state, and has the powers and duties specified in this code and Section 12172.5 of the Government Code.(b) (1) The Secretary of State shall make reasonable efforts to do all of the following:(A) Promote voter registration to eligible voters.(B) Encourage eligible voters to vote.(C) Promote pre-registration to eligible citizens.(D) Promote civic learning and engagement to prepare students and new citizens to register to vote and to vote.(2) In undertaking these efforts, the Secretary of State shall prioritize communities that have been historically underrepresented in voter registration or voting.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 10 of the Elections Code is amended to read:10. (a) The Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state, and has the powers and duties specified in this code and Section 12172.5 of the Government Code.(b) (1) The Secretary of State shall make reasonable efforts to do all of the following:(A) Promote voter registration to eligible voters.(B) Encourage eligible voters to vote.(C) Promote pre-registration to eligible citizens.(D) Promote civic learning and engagement to prepare students and new citizens to register to vote and to vote.(2) In undertaking these efforts, the Secretary of State shall prioritize communities that have been historically underrepresented in voter registration or voting.

SECTION 1. Section 10 of the Elections Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

10. (a) The Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state, and has the powers and duties specified in this code and Section 12172.5 of the Government Code.(b) (1) The Secretary of State shall make reasonable efforts to do all of the following:(A) Promote voter registration to eligible voters.(B) Encourage eligible voters to vote.(C) Promote pre-registration to eligible citizens.(D) Promote civic learning and engagement to prepare students and new citizens to register to vote and to vote.(2) In undertaking these efforts, the Secretary of State shall prioritize communities that have been historically underrepresented in voter registration or voting.

10. (a) The Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state, and has the powers and duties specified in this code and Section 12172.5 of the Government Code.(b) (1) The Secretary of State shall make reasonable efforts to do all of the following:(A) Promote voter registration to eligible voters.(B) Encourage eligible voters to vote.(C) Promote pre-registration to eligible citizens.(D) Promote civic learning and engagement to prepare students and new citizens to register to vote and to vote.(2) In undertaking these efforts, the Secretary of State shall prioritize communities that have been historically underrepresented in voter registration or voting.

10. (a) The Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state, and has the powers and duties specified in this code and Section 12172.5 of the Government Code.(b) (1) The Secretary of State shall make reasonable efforts to do all of the following:(A) Promote voter registration to eligible voters.(B) Encourage eligible voters to vote.(C) Promote pre-registration to eligible citizens.(D) Promote civic learning and engagement to prepare students and new citizens to register to vote and to vote.(2) In undertaking these efforts, the Secretary of State shall prioritize communities that have been historically underrepresented in voter registration or voting.



10. (a) The Secretary of State is the chief elections officer of the state, and has the powers and duties specified in this code and Section 12172.5 of the Government Code.

(b) (1) The Secretary of State shall make reasonable efforts to do all of the following:

(A) Promote voter registration to eligible voters.

(B) Encourage eligible voters to vote.

(C) Promote pre-registration to eligible citizens.

(D) Promote civic learning and engagement to prepare students and new citizens to register to vote and to vote.

(2) In undertaking these efforts, the Secretary of State shall prioritize communities that have been historically underrepresented in voter registration or voting.