California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB55 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/15/2017

                    Amended IN  Senate  March 15, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 55Introduced by Senator JacksonDecember 05, 2016 An act to repeal amend Section 8490.7 of the Education Code, relating to after school programs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 55, as amended, Jackson. After school programs: The Distinguished After School Health Recognition Program. Existing law establishes, until January 1, 2018, the Distinguished After School Health (DASH) Recognition Program, to be administered by the State Department of Education. Existing law requires the department to develop a process, administered on the departments Internet Web site, whereby an after school program, as defined, may be recognized as meeting prescribed requirements, including training staff on healthy eating and physical activity, providing healthy food and drinks to program attendees, and providing program attendees with physical activity and limited screen time, as defined. Existing law requires the department to include in the process on the Internet Web site an option to create a certificate, using a template designed by the department, that includes specified information, including a document, signed by the after school program director, demonstrating the manner in which the after school program meets the above requirements. Existing law provides that funding for the DASH Recognition Program is subject to an appropriation made for these purposes in the annual Budget Act or another statute, or the receipt of funding from nonstate sources.This bill would extend the DASH Recognition Program indefinitely. until January 1, 2023.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 8490.7 of the Education Code is amended to read:8490.7. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2023, deletes or extends that date.SECTION 1.Section 8490.7 of the Education Code is repealed.

 Amended IN  Senate  March 15, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 55Introduced by Senator JacksonDecember 05, 2016 An act to repeal amend Section 8490.7 of the Education Code, relating to after school programs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 55, as amended, Jackson. After school programs: The Distinguished After School Health Recognition Program. Existing law establishes, until January 1, 2018, the Distinguished After School Health (DASH) Recognition Program, to be administered by the State Department of Education. Existing law requires the department to develop a process, administered on the departments Internet Web site, whereby an after school program, as defined, may be recognized as meeting prescribed requirements, including training staff on healthy eating and physical activity, providing healthy food and drinks to program attendees, and providing program attendees with physical activity and limited screen time, as defined. Existing law requires the department to include in the process on the Internet Web site an option to create a certificate, using a template designed by the department, that includes specified information, including a document, signed by the after school program director, demonstrating the manner in which the after school program meets the above requirements. Existing law provides that funding for the DASH Recognition Program is subject to an appropriation made for these purposes in the annual Budget Act or another statute, or the receipt of funding from nonstate sources.This bill would extend the DASH Recognition Program indefinitely. until January 1, 2023.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Amended IN  Senate  March 15, 2017

Amended IN  Senate  March 15, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Bill No. 55

Introduced by Senator JacksonDecember 05, 2016

Introduced by Senator Jackson
December 05, 2016

 An act to repeal amend Section 8490.7 of the Education Code, relating to after school programs. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 55, as amended, Jackson. After school programs: The Distinguished After School Health Recognition Program. 

Existing law establishes, until January 1, 2018, the Distinguished After School Health (DASH) Recognition Program, to be administered by the State Department of Education. Existing law requires the department to develop a process, administered on the departments Internet Web site, whereby an after school program, as defined, may be recognized as meeting prescribed requirements, including training staff on healthy eating and physical activity, providing healthy food and drinks to program attendees, and providing program attendees with physical activity and limited screen time, as defined. Existing law requires the department to include in the process on the Internet Web site an option to create a certificate, using a template designed by the department, that includes specified information, including a document, signed by the after school program director, demonstrating the manner in which the after school program meets the above requirements. Existing law provides that funding for the DASH Recognition Program is subject to an appropriation made for these purposes in the annual Budget Act or another statute, or the receipt of funding from nonstate sources.This bill would extend the DASH Recognition Program indefinitely. until January 1, 2023.

Existing law establishes, until January 1, 2018, the Distinguished After School Health (DASH) Recognition Program, to be administered by the State Department of Education. Existing law requires the department to develop a process, administered on the departments Internet Web site, whereby an after school program, as defined, may be recognized as meeting prescribed requirements, including training staff on healthy eating and physical activity, providing healthy food and drinks to program attendees, and providing program attendees with physical activity and limited screen time, as defined. Existing law requires the department to include in the process on the Internet Web site an option to create a certificate, using a template designed by the department, that includes specified information, including a document, signed by the after school program director, demonstrating the manner in which the after school program meets the above requirements. Existing law provides that funding for the DASH Recognition Program is subject to an appropriation made for these purposes in the annual Budget Act or another statute, or the receipt of funding from nonstate sources.

This bill would extend the DASH Recognition Program indefinitely. until January 1, 2023.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 8490.7 of the Education Code is amended to read:8490.7. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2023, deletes or extends that date.SECTION 1.Section 8490.7 of the Education Code is repealed.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 8490.7 of the Education Code is amended to read:8490.7. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2023, deletes or extends that date.

SECTION 1. Section 8490.7 of the Education Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

8490.7. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2023, deletes or extends that date.

8490.7. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2023, deletes or extends that date.

8490.7. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2023, deletes or extends that date.



8490.7. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, 2023, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, 2023, deletes or extends that date.