California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR119 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/04/2018

                    Enrolled  May 04, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  April 05, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  May 03, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 119Introduced by Senator JacksonMarch 20, 2018 Relative to California YMCA Safety Around Water Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 119, Jackson. May 2018: California YMCA Safety Around Water Month.This measure would observe May 2018 as California YMCA Safety Around Water Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, According to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, drowning is the leading cause of accidental death for children zero to four years of age, inclusive; and WHEREAS, According to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, drowning is the second-leading cause of accidental death for children five to 14 years of age, inclusive; and WHEREAS, In the United States, two children drown every day; and WHEREAS, Eighty-eight percent of all child drowning incidents occur when an adult is present; and WHEREAS, Ninety percent of all child drowning incidents occur within 30 feet of safety and 60 percent occur within 10 feet of safety; and WHEREAS, In 2013, in California, there were 60 drowning fatalities and 804 immersion-related emergency visits and hospitalizations for children zero to four years of age, inclusive; and WHEREAS, In 2013, in California, there were 25 drowning fatalities and 207 immersion-related emergency visits and hospitalizations for children five to 17 years of age, inclusive; and WHEREAS, The Young Mens Christian Association (YMCA or the Y) teaches one million children to swim each year in the United States and has been Californias leading swim instruction resource for over 100 years; and WHEREAS, The Y offers an evidence-based water safety program for children and families called Safety Around Water, which teaches young children and their caregivers life-saving water skills (Swim, Float, Swim and Jump, Push, Turn, Grab) and knowledge to prevent drowning and encourages participation in aquatics as a healthy fitness and recreational activity; and WHEREAS, The California State Alliance of YMCAs has a statewide commitment to reducing childhood drowning through the Safety Around Water program; and WHEREAS, The YMCAs in California offering the Safety Around Water program do so at no charge to participants; and WHEREAS, The month of May of each year is recognized as National Drowning Prevention Month; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the month of May 2018 be observed as California YMCA Safety Around Water Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. 

 Enrolled  May 04, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  April 05, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  May 03, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 119Introduced by Senator JacksonMarch 20, 2018 Relative to California YMCA Safety Around Water Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 119, Jackson. May 2018: California YMCA Safety Around Water Month.This measure would observe May 2018 as California YMCA Safety Around Water Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  May 04, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  April 05, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  May 03, 2018

Enrolled  May 04, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  April 05, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  May 03, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 119

Introduced by Senator JacksonMarch 20, 2018

Introduced by Senator Jackson
March 20, 2018

 Relative to California YMCA Safety Around Water Month. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 119, Jackson. May 2018: California YMCA Safety Around Water Month.

This measure would observe May 2018 as California YMCA Safety Around Water Month.

This measure would observe May 2018 as California YMCA Safety Around Water Month.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, According to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, drowning is the leading cause of accidental death for children zero to four years of age, inclusive; and 

WHEREAS, According to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, drowning is the second-leading cause of accidental death for children five to 14 years of age, inclusive; and 

WHEREAS, In the United States, two children drown every day; and 

WHEREAS, Eighty-eight percent of all child drowning incidents occur when an adult is present; and 

WHEREAS, Ninety percent of all child drowning incidents occur within 30 feet of safety and 60 percent occur within 10 feet of safety; and 

WHEREAS, In 2013, in California, there were 60 drowning fatalities and 804 immersion-related emergency visits and hospitalizations for children zero to four years of age, inclusive; and 

WHEREAS, In 2013, in California, there were 25 drowning fatalities and 207 immersion-related emergency visits and hospitalizations for children five to 17 years of age, inclusive; and 

WHEREAS, The Young Mens Christian Association (YMCA or the Y) teaches one million children to swim each year in the United States and has been Californias leading swim instruction resource for over 100 years; and 

WHEREAS, The Y offers an evidence-based water safety program for children and families called Safety Around Water, which teaches young children and their caregivers life-saving water skills (Swim, Float, Swim and Jump, Push, Turn, Grab) and knowledge to prevent drowning and encourages participation in aquatics as a healthy fitness and recreational activity; and 

WHEREAS, The California State Alliance of YMCAs has a statewide commitment to reducing childhood drowning through the Safety Around Water program; and 

WHEREAS, The YMCAs in California offering the Safety Around Water program do so at no charge to participants; and 

WHEREAS, The month of May of each year is recognized as National Drowning Prevention Month; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the month of May 2018 be observed as California YMCA Safety Around Water Month; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.