California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR139 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/29/2018

                    Enrolled  August 29, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 139Introduced by Senator MonningApril 30, 2018 Relative to No Straw November. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 139, Monning. No Straw November.This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California values the health of its ocean and coast; andWHEREAS, California is a global leader in taking action to protect the health of the ocean and coast; andWHEREAS, Plastic pollution poses a significant threat to the health of Californias ocean resources and coastal environment, and to the publics enjoyment of that environment; andWHEREAS, Plastic straws pose a health risk to ocean wildlife when accidentally ingested; andWHEREAS, Plastic straws are frequently littered or dropped by individuals, escape from waste management systems, and can get deposited onto the beach and washed into storm drains, streams, rivers, and eventually the ocean; andWHEREAS, Reducing consumption of plastic straws can help decrease plastic pollution in the ocean and Californias coastal environment; andWHEREAS, Recognizing the negative environmental impact of plastic straws, many restaurants and other establishments in California and around the United States have voluntarily stopped providing plastic straws; andWHEREAS, Customers should be encouraged to make informed choices when considering ways to reduce their impacts on the environment; andWHEREAS, The California State Senate recognizes the efforts of Girl Scout Shelby ONeil, the founder of Jr Ocean Guardians, to raise awareness about the problem of ocean plastic, and to reduce pollution from plastic straws by starting the No Straw November initiative; andWHEREAS, In the No Straw November initiative, participants pledge to refuse straws for the month of November; andWHEREAS, Shelby ONeil attributes her love of the ocean and founding of Jr Ocean Guardians to her service as a Teen Conservation Leader at Monterey Bay Aquarium; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the month of November shall be recognized as No Straw November; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor of California and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 29, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 139Introduced by Senator MonningApril 30, 2018 Relative to No Straw November. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 139, Monning. No Straw November.This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  August 29, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2018

Enrolled  August 29, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  June 21, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  August 23, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 139

Introduced by Senator MonningApril 30, 2018

Introduced by Senator Monning
April 30, 2018

 Relative to No Straw November. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 139, Monning. No Straw November.

This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.

This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, California values the health of its ocean and coast; and

WHEREAS, California is a global leader in taking action to protect the health of the ocean and coast; and

WHEREAS, Plastic pollution poses a significant threat to the health of Californias ocean resources and coastal environment, and to the publics enjoyment of that environment; and

WHEREAS, Plastic straws pose a health risk to ocean wildlife when accidentally ingested; and

WHEREAS, Plastic straws are frequently littered or dropped by individuals, escape from waste management systems, and can get deposited onto the beach and washed into storm drains, streams, rivers, and eventually the ocean; and

WHEREAS, Reducing consumption of plastic straws can help decrease plastic pollution in the ocean and Californias coastal environment; and

WHEREAS, Recognizing the negative environmental impact of plastic straws, many restaurants and other establishments in California and around the United States have voluntarily stopped providing plastic straws; and

WHEREAS, Customers should be encouraged to make informed choices when considering ways to reduce their impacts on the environment; and

WHEREAS, The California State Senate recognizes the efforts of Girl Scout Shelby ONeil, the founder of Jr Ocean Guardians, to raise awareness about the problem of ocean plastic, and to reduce pollution from plastic straws by starting the No Straw November initiative; and

WHEREAS, In the No Straw November initiative, participants pledge to refuse straws for the month of November; and

WHEREAS, Shelby ONeil attributes her love of the ocean and founding of Jr Ocean Guardians to her service as a Teen Conservation Leader at Monterey Bay Aquarium; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the month of November shall be recognized as No Straw November; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor of California and to the author for appropriate distribution.