Enrolled April 28, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 27, 2017 Amended IN Senate March 21, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 18Introduced by Senator Berryhill(Coauthor: Senator Allen)January 25, 2017Relative to organ and tissue donation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 18, Berryhill. Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month.This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in California and would encourage all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The Legislature has established an official state organ and tissue donor registry that has become the largest in the world, with nearly 14 million people signed up to save and heal the lives of others after death; andWHEREAS, The 11-year official partnership between Donate Life California and the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) has produced 95 percent of donors on the registry through the DMV with a simple check-off box; andWHEREAS, The Legislature has approved the innovative Living Donation California information and referral tool to encourage living kidney donation; andWHEREAS, The Superintendent of Public Instruction has recognized Donate Life Californias high school education program, which has educated students about organ, eye, and tissue donation for the past six years; andWHEREAS, California has the greatest need for transplantation in the nation; with nearly 22,000 residents waiting for a second chance at life, representing one in five on the national waiting list; andWHEREAS, Nine hundred thirty-eight Californians became organ donors in 2016 and 3,866 life-saving transplants were performed in our state that year. Tragically, 994 people died while waiting due to the shortage of available organs; andWHEREAS, Sadly, in 2016, California had the longest waiting time in the nation for kidney transplants, and the most deaths while waiting, and only 40 percent of Californians sign up as donors; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That in recognition of the month of April as National Donate Life Month, the Legislature proclaims the month of April 2017 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in the State of California; and be it furtherResolved, That in doing so, the Legislature encourages all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry by checking YES! for organ and tissue donation when applying for or renewing a drivers license or identification card, or by signing up at www.donateLIFEcalifornia.org or www.doneVIDAcalifornia.org; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature underscores its renewed efforts to save more lives through donor registration and calls on all Members of the Legislature to consider how to share information about the cause and about actions to help their constituents in need; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Enrolled April 28, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 27, 2017 Amended IN Senate March 21, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 18Introduced by Senator Berryhill(Coauthor: Senator Allen)January 25, 2017Relative to organ and tissue donation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 18, Berryhill. Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month.This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in California and would encourage all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Enrolled April 28, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 27, 2017 Amended IN Senate March 21, 2017 Enrolled April 28, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 27, 2017 Amended IN Senate March 21, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 18 Introduced by Senator Berryhill(Coauthor: Senator Allen)January 25, 2017 Introduced by Senator Berryhill(Coauthor: Senator Allen) January 25, 2017 Relative to organ and tissue donation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 18, Berryhill. Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month. This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in California and would encourage all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry. This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in California and would encourage all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, The Legislature has established an official state organ and tissue donor registry that has become the largest in the world, with nearly 14 million people signed up to save and heal the lives of others after death; and WHEREAS, The 11-year official partnership between Donate Life California and the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) has produced 95 percent of donors on the registry through the DMV with a simple check-off box; and WHEREAS, The Legislature has approved the innovative Living Donation California information and referral tool to encourage living kidney donation; and WHEREAS, The Superintendent of Public Instruction has recognized Donate Life Californias high school education program, which has educated students about organ, eye, and tissue donation for the past six years; and WHEREAS, California has the greatest need for transplantation in the nation; with nearly 22,000 residents waiting for a second chance at life, representing one in five on the national waiting list; and WHEREAS, Nine hundred thirty-eight Californians became organ donors in 2016 and 3,866 life-saving transplants were performed in our state that year. Tragically, 994 people died while waiting due to the shortage of available organs; and WHEREAS, Sadly, in 2016, California had the longest waiting time in the nation for kidney transplants, and the most deaths while waiting, and only 40 percent of Californians sign up as donors; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That in recognition of the month of April as National Donate Life Month, the Legislature proclaims the month of April 2017 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in the State of California; and be it further Resolved, That in doing so, the Legislature encourages all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry by checking YES! for organ and tissue donation when applying for or renewing a drivers license or identification card, or by signing up at www.donateLIFEcalifornia.org or www.doneVIDAcalifornia.org; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature underscores its renewed efforts to save more lives through donor registration and calls on all Members of the Legislature to consider how to share information about the cause and about actions to help their constituents in need; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.