California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR19 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/03/2017

                    Enrolled  April 03, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 16, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  March 30, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 19Introduced by Senator NguyenFebruary 08, 2017Relative to Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 19, Nguyen. Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) estimates that about one-half of United States adults over 30 years of age have some form of periodontal disease; andWHEREAS, In California, this number is estimated to range from 46 to 47 percent; andWHEREAS, The CDC reports that periodontitis disproportionately affects ethnic minorities, those of lower socioeconomic status, and those in areas with limited access to dental care, of which California has many; andWHEREAS, Periodontal disease significantly correlates with an increased risk or worsening of many serious medical conditions, including, but not limited to, cardiovascular disease, diabetes, pregnancy complications, metabolic syndrome, Alzheimers disease, and even certain cancers; andWHEREAS, The State Department of Health Care Services recently reduced the Denti-Cal reimbursement rate by almost 60 percent for the ongoing treatment required for people with periodontal disease; andWHEREAS, Research published in the American Journal of Preventive Medicine suggests that the treatment of periodontal disease for those with chronic illnesses resulted in better health outcomes and reduced overall health care spending and inpatient hospital admissions; andWHEREAS, It is vital that policymakers better understand the impact of periodontal disease, especially to aging populations, and the costs associated with allowing the disease to progress; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims March of each year as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  April 03, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 16, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  March 30, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 19Introduced by Senator NguyenFebruary 08, 2017Relative to Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 19, Nguyen. Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  April 03, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 16, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  March 30, 2017

Enrolled  April 03, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  March 16, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  March 30, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 19

Introduced by Senator NguyenFebruary 08, 2017

Introduced by Senator Nguyen
February 08, 2017

Relative to Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 19, Nguyen. Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.

This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.

This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) estimates that about one-half of United States adults over 30 years of age have some form of periodontal disease; and

WHEREAS, In California, this number is estimated to range from 46 to 47 percent; and

WHEREAS, The CDC reports that periodontitis disproportionately affects ethnic minorities, those of lower socioeconomic status, and those in areas with limited access to dental care, of which California has many; and

WHEREAS, Periodontal disease significantly correlates with an increased risk or worsening of many serious medical conditions, including, but not limited to, cardiovascular disease, diabetes, pregnancy complications, metabolic syndrome, Alzheimers disease, and even certain cancers; and

WHEREAS, The State Department of Health Care Services recently reduced the Denti-Cal reimbursement rate by almost 60 percent for the ongoing treatment required for people with periodontal disease; and

WHEREAS, Research published in the American Journal of Preventive Medicine suggests that the treatment of periodontal disease for those with chronic illnesses resulted in better health outcomes and reduced overall health care spending and inpatient hospital admissions; and

WHEREAS, It is vital that policymakers better understand the impact of periodontal disease, especially to aging populations, and the costs associated with allowing the disease to progress; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims March of each year as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.