California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR27 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/01/2017

                    Enrolled  September 01, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 02, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 27Introduced by Senator GainesFebruary 23, 2017 Relative to Prostate Cancer Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 27, Gaines. Prostate Cancer Awareness Month.This measure would proclaim the month of September 2017 as Prostate Cancer Awareness Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Prostate cancer is the most frequently diagnosed cancer in men aside from skin cancer. An estimated one in eight men will develop this disease in his lifetime; andWHEREAS, The American Cancer Society estimates that there will be 161,360 new cases of prostate cancer in the United States in 2017, resulting in an estimated 26,730 deaths; andWHEREAS, An estimated 14,520 men in California will be diagnosed with prostate cancer this year, and an estimated 3,130 men in California will die from this disease; andWHEREAS, Men of African American descent have the highest prostate cancer incidence rates in the world, and their prostate cancer mortality rate in the United States is more than twice that of any other ethnic group of men; andWHEREAS, Early prostate cancer usually has no symptoms, and studies suggest strong familial predisposition may be responsible for 5 percent to 10 percent of the disease cases; andWHEREAS, Advanced prostate cancer commonly spreads to the bones, which can cause pain in the hips, spine, ribs, or other areas in the body; andWHEREAS, The five-year survival rate approaches 100 percent when prostate cancer is diagnosed and treated early, but it drops to 29 percent when it spreads to other parts of the body; andWHEREAS, Treatment options for prostate cancer vary depending on a mans age, the stage and grade of his cancer, and his other existing medical conditions; andWHEREAS, The American Cancer Society recommends that a man should have an opportunity to make an informed decision about whether to be tested for prostate cancer based on his personal values and preferences; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2017 as Prostate Cancer Awareness Month in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature joins communities across our nation to increase awareness about the importance for men to make informed decisions with their health care providers about early detection and testing for prostate cancer; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 01, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 02, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 27Introduced by Senator GainesFebruary 23, 2017 Relative to Prostate Cancer Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 27, Gaines. Prostate Cancer Awareness Month.This measure would proclaim the month of September 2017 as Prostate Cancer Awareness Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  September 01, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 02, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2017

Enrolled  September 01, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  March 02, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  August 31, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 27

Introduced by Senator GainesFebruary 23, 2017

Introduced by Senator Gaines
February 23, 2017

 Relative to Prostate Cancer Awareness Month.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 27, Gaines. Prostate Cancer Awareness Month.

This measure would proclaim the month of September 2017 as Prostate Cancer Awareness Month in California.

This measure would proclaim the month of September 2017 as Prostate Cancer Awareness Month in California.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Prostate cancer is the most frequently diagnosed cancer in men aside from skin cancer. An estimated one in eight men will develop this disease in his lifetime; and

WHEREAS, The American Cancer Society estimates that there will be 161,360 new cases of prostate cancer in the United States in 2017, resulting in an estimated 26,730 deaths; and

WHEREAS, An estimated 14,520 men in California will be diagnosed with prostate cancer this year, and an estimated 3,130 men in California will die from this disease; and

WHEREAS, Men of African American descent have the highest prostate cancer incidence rates in the world, and their prostate cancer mortality rate in the United States is more than twice that of any other ethnic group of men; and

WHEREAS, Early prostate cancer usually has no symptoms, and studies suggest strong familial predisposition may be responsible for 5 percent to 10 percent of the disease cases; and

WHEREAS, Advanced prostate cancer commonly spreads to the bones, which can cause pain in the hips, spine, ribs, or other areas in the body; and

WHEREAS, The five-year survival rate approaches 100 percent when prostate cancer is diagnosed and treated early, but it drops to 29 percent when it spreads to other parts of the body; and

WHEREAS, Treatment options for prostate cancer vary depending on a mans age, the stage and grade of his cancer, and his other existing medical conditions; and

WHEREAS, The American Cancer Society recommends that a man should have an opportunity to make an informed decision about whether to be tested for prostate cancer based on his personal values and preferences; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2017 as Prostate Cancer Awareness Month in California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature joins communities across our nation to increase awareness about the importance for men to make informed decisions with their health care providers about early detection and testing for prostate cancer; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.