California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR29 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/04/2017

                    Enrolled  April 04, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 02, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  March 30, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 29Introduced by Senator Beall(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Reyes, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)February 28, 2017 Relative to Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 29, Beall. Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month.This measure would recognize March 2017 as Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against blood cancers.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, According to the American Cancer Society, multiple myeloma is a blood cancer formed from malignant plasma cells found in the bone marrow; and WHEREAS, Multiple myeloma is the second most common blood cancer worldwide and currently afflicts more than 100,000 people in the United States; andWHEREAS, An estimated 30,000 new cases are diagnosed each year; andWHEREAS, Multiple myeloma is twice as common in African Americans than in Caucasian Americans, and someone with a sibling or parent who is diagnosed with multiple myeloma is four times more likely to be diagnosed; and WHEREAS, Early symptoms of multiple myeloma may be bone problems, such as bone pain in the back, hips, or skull, types of bone weakness, and the detection of a shortage of red blood cells, white blood cells, and blood platelets; andWHEREAS, An increased awareness of multiple myeloma for clinicians and the general public will lead to earlier diagnosis and better treatment, allowing people to live longer and with a higher quality of life; andWHEREAS, The State of California is committed to increase awareness of multiple myeloma and encourages continued investment into blood cancer research, as innovation to achieve early diagnosis and other advancements may lead to the more effective and safer treatments for multiple myeloma patients; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes March 2017 as Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month in California in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against blood cancers; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  April 04, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 02, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  March 30, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 29Introduced by Senator Beall(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Reyes, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)February 28, 2017 Relative to Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 29, Beall. Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month.This measure would recognize March 2017 as Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against blood cancers.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  April 04, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 02, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  March 30, 2017

Enrolled  April 04, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  March 02, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  March 30, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 29

Introduced by Senator Beall(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Reyes, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)February 28, 2017

Introduced by Senator Beall(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Reyes, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)
February 28, 2017

 Relative to Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 29, Beall. Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month.

This measure would recognize March 2017 as Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against blood cancers.

This measure would recognize March 2017 as Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against blood cancers.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, According to the American Cancer Society, multiple myeloma is a blood cancer formed from malignant plasma cells found in the bone marrow; and 

WHEREAS, Multiple myeloma is the second most common blood cancer worldwide and currently afflicts more than 100,000 people in the United States; and

WHEREAS, An estimated 30,000 new cases are diagnosed each year; and

WHEREAS, Multiple myeloma is twice as common in African Americans than in Caucasian Americans, and someone with a sibling or parent who is diagnosed with multiple myeloma is four times more likely to be diagnosed; and 

WHEREAS, Early symptoms of multiple myeloma may be bone problems, such as bone pain in the back, hips, or skull, types of bone weakness, and the detection of a shortage of red blood cells, white blood cells, and blood platelets; and

WHEREAS, An increased awareness of multiple myeloma for clinicians and the general public will lead to earlier diagnosis and better treatment, allowing people to live longer and with a higher quality of life; and

WHEREAS, The State of California is committed to increase awareness of multiple myeloma and encourages continued investment into blood cancer research, as innovation to achieve early diagnosis and other advancements may lead to the more effective and safer treatments for multiple myeloma patients; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes March 2017 as Multiple Myeloma Awareness Month in California in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against blood cancers; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.