California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR30 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/30/2017

                    Enrolled  June 30, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 16, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  June 29, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 30Introduced by Senator PanMarch 02, 2017 Relative to education technology. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 30, Pan. Education technology.This measure would recognize the need for improving the ongoing implementation and use of technology in educational institutions and identifying best practices for technology equipment upgrades.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The educational community as a whole recognizes the importance of modern technology within our communities and classrooms; andWHEREAS, There is a need for long-term planning in a regularly changing environment, as well as ongoing strategic plans for replacing and upgrading technology equipment and support structures in an educational institutions master planning; andWHEREAS, Identifying and agreeing upon best practices to emphasize user input, support input, and equipment maintenance over the long term will allow for the best use of resources and time; andWHEREAS, In order to remain on the cutting edge of technology use, all stakeholders have a duty and right to share in the decisionmaking process regarding policies at the worksite and school district levels; andWHEREAS, The use or nonuse of technology should not drive the teaching environment and school faculty should be free to determine the appropriate use of technology; andWHEREAS, School support staff is essential to successful integration and implementation of technology and network security; andWHEREAS, New and ongoing training about education technology and related pedagogies requires input from faculty, staff, and pupils; andWHEREAS, Faculty and staff are not always provided with accommodating technologies, services, and training as required by federal and state accessibility regulations; andWHEREAS, The cost of sustained staffing, maintenance, and training is not regularly incorporated in budgets; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the need for improving the ongoing implementation and use of technology in educational institutions and identifying best practices for technology equipment upgrades; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  June 30, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 16, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  June 29, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 30Introduced by Senator PanMarch 02, 2017 Relative to education technology. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 30, Pan. Education technology.This measure would recognize the need for improving the ongoing implementation and use of technology in educational institutions and identifying best practices for technology equipment upgrades.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  June 30, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 16, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  June 29, 2017

Enrolled  June 30, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  March 16, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  June 29, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 30

Introduced by Senator PanMarch 02, 2017

Introduced by Senator Pan
March 02, 2017

 Relative to education technology. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 30, Pan. Education technology.

This measure would recognize the need for improving the ongoing implementation and use of technology in educational institutions and identifying best practices for technology equipment upgrades.

This measure would recognize the need for improving the ongoing implementation and use of technology in educational institutions and identifying best practices for technology equipment upgrades.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The educational community as a whole recognizes the importance of modern technology within our communities and classrooms; and

WHEREAS, There is a need for long-term planning in a regularly changing environment, as well as ongoing strategic plans for replacing and upgrading technology equipment and support structures in an educational institutions master planning; and

WHEREAS, Identifying and agreeing upon best practices to emphasize user input, support input, and equipment maintenance over the long term will allow for the best use of resources and time; and

WHEREAS, In order to remain on the cutting edge of technology use, all stakeholders have a duty and right to share in the decisionmaking process regarding policies at the worksite and school district levels; and

WHEREAS, The use or nonuse of technology should not drive the teaching environment and school faculty should be free to determine the appropriate use of technology; and

WHEREAS, School support staff is essential to successful integration and implementation of technology and network security; and

WHEREAS, New and ongoing training about education technology and related pedagogies requires input from faculty, staff, and pupils; and

WHEREAS, Faculty and staff are not always provided with accommodating technologies, services, and training as required by federal and state accessibility regulations; and

WHEREAS, The cost of sustained staffing, maintenance, and training is not regularly incorporated in budgets; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the need for improving the ongoing implementation and use of technology in educational institutions and identifying best practices for technology equipment upgrades; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.