California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR35 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/05/2017

                    Enrolled  May 05, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 23, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 04, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 35Introduced by Senator BeallMarch 08, 2017 Relative to Infrastructure Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 35, Beall. Infrastructure Week.This measure would recognize the week of May 15, 2017, to May 19, 2017, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and would urge the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The week of May 15, 2017, to May 19, 2017, inclusive, is being observed at the state and national levels as Infrastructure Week; andWHEREAS, The people of California rely on critical infrastructure, such as roads and bridges, railroads and transit systems, ports and airports, pipes and water systems, reliable power supply, passive and active open space, and access to broadband; andWHEREAS, This infrastructure enhances our local and regional economy, our quality and enjoyment of life, our safety, and the strength of our communities; andWHEREAS, Decades of underfunding and deferred maintenance have pushed infrastructure across the state to the brink of crisis, with preventable catastrophic failures occurring in some communities; andWHEREAS, The poor condition of California risks losing its competitive advantage by failing to adequately invest in its infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Californias infrastructure and transportation systems are more than a drag on the economy, it can be harmful to our health and safety, even though tragedies resulting from infrastructure failures are most often preventable with adequate investment; andWHEREAS, Every dollar invested in infrastructure generates nearly $2 in economic output; andWHEREAS, To grow our economy, keep people safe, strengthen our communities, and preserve and protect our green infrastructure and environment, we need all levels of government and the private sector to work together to rebuild and repair all of our infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week 2017 has been established to highlight infrastructure investment needs in communities throughout California, and to recognize and encourage leadership at the federal, state, and local levels to address our pressing infrastructure challenges; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week challenges policymakers and the public to address head-on the challenges facing green and traditional infrastructure, to move beyond short-term fixes and deferred maintenance, and to envision the innovative solutions, technologies, policies, and investments that will improve our infrastructure today and in the future; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the week of May 15, 2017, to May 19, 2017, as Infrastructure Week, and urges the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations; and be it further Resolved, That despite fiscal challenges, it is important for the Legislature to dedicate sufficient resources to transportation, infrastructure, and green investments in our community; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  May 05, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 23, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 04, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 35Introduced by Senator BeallMarch 08, 2017 Relative to Infrastructure Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 35, Beall. Infrastructure Week.This measure would recognize the week of May 15, 2017, to May 19, 2017, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and would urge the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  May 05, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  March 23, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  May 04, 2017

Enrolled  May 05, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  March 23, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  May 04, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 35

Introduced by Senator BeallMarch 08, 2017

Introduced by Senator Beall
March 08, 2017

 Relative to Infrastructure Week. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 35, Beall. Infrastructure Week.

This measure would recognize the week of May 15, 2017, to May 19, 2017, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and would urge the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations.

This measure would recognize the week of May 15, 2017, to May 19, 2017, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and would urge the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The week of May 15, 2017, to May 19, 2017, inclusive, is being observed at the state and national levels as Infrastructure Week; and

WHEREAS, The people of California rely on critical infrastructure, such as roads and bridges, railroads and transit systems, ports and airports, pipes and water systems, reliable power supply, passive and active open space, and access to broadband; and

WHEREAS, This infrastructure enhances our local and regional economy, our quality and enjoyment of life, our safety, and the strength of our communities; and

WHEREAS, Decades of underfunding and deferred maintenance have pushed infrastructure across the state to the brink of crisis, with preventable catastrophic failures occurring in some communities; and

WHEREAS, The poor condition of California risks losing its competitive advantage by failing to adequately invest in its infrastructure; and

WHEREAS, Californias infrastructure and transportation systems are more than a drag on the economy, it can be harmful to our health and safety, even though tragedies resulting from infrastructure failures are most often preventable with adequate investment; and

WHEREAS, Every dollar invested in infrastructure generates nearly $2 in economic output; and

WHEREAS, To grow our economy, keep people safe, strengthen our communities, and preserve and protect our green infrastructure and environment, we need all levels of government and the private sector to work together to rebuild and repair all of our infrastructure; and

WHEREAS, Infrastructure Week 2017 has been established to highlight infrastructure investment needs in communities throughout California, and to recognize and encourage leadership at the federal, state, and local levels to address our pressing infrastructure challenges; and

WHEREAS, Infrastructure Week challenges policymakers and the public to address head-on the challenges facing green and traditional infrastructure, to move beyond short-term fixes and deferred maintenance, and to envision the innovative solutions, technologies, policies, and investments that will improve our infrastructure today and in the future; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the week of May 15, 2017, to May 19, 2017, as Infrastructure Week, and urges the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations; and be it further 

Resolved, That despite fiscal challenges, it is important for the Legislature to dedicate sufficient resources to transportation, infrastructure, and green investments in our community; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.