California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR112 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/01/2018

                    Enrolled  June 01, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  May 31, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  May 29, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 112Introduced by Senators Allen, De Len, Hertzberg, Lara, Portantino, and SternMay 16, 2018Relative to the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation AreaLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 112, Allen. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, This year marks the 40th anniversary of the establishment of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area, which was formed after local residents organized to take action to preserve open-space and recreational lands in the Santa Monica Mountains and protect those lands from uncontrolled development; and WHEREAS, Congressman Anthony C. Beilenson introduced federal legislation to establish the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area following a concerted local campaign; and WHEREAS, In 1978, the United States Congress established the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area to be managed by the National Park Service in partnership with state and local governments; and WHEREAS, Thirty years ago, the Santa Monica Mountains Fund was created by the Santa Monica Mountains Parklands Association formed by concerned citizens to represent the interests of the public in the development of parklands and recreational opportunities in the Santa Monica Mountains, and to provide the public with an opportunity to contribute to programs that protect lands in the Santa Monica Mountains; and WHEREAS, The Santa Monica Mountains Fund has provided financial support for a variety of interesting programs in the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area, including wildlife preservation, mountain lion protection, and educational presentations, and funding for many hiking, biking, and recreational opportunities; and WHEREAS, The staff of the Santa Monica Mountains Fund continues to work in close partnership with federal and state park agencies that operate in the Santa Monica Mountains, and the fund sponsors scientific research and student internships that contribute to the success of projects to preserve and enhance open-space land and wildlife in the Santa Monica Mountains; and WHEREAS, The preservation of lands in the Santa Monica Mountains could not have been accomplished without the collaborative effort and actions of members of the local community who worked together to protect mountain lands; and WHEREAS, This year the people of California will celebrate 40 years since the formation of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area and focus on the future as we look ahead to the next generation of park stewards who will be charged with preserving and enhancing valuable natural resources and lands in the Santa Monica Mountains; now, therefore, be it Resolved, by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes 2018 as the 40th anniversary of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area and urges all involved public agencies and the local community to continue to work collaboratively on the successful management of the recreation area for the perpetual use and enjoyment of the public; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  June 01, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  May 31, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  May 29, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 112Introduced by Senators Allen, De Len, Hertzberg, Lara, Portantino, and SternMay 16, 2018Relative to the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation AreaLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 112, Allen. Digest Key

 Enrolled  June 01, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  May 31, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  May 29, 2018

Enrolled  June 01, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  May 31, 2018
Amended IN  Senate  May 29, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 112

Introduced by Senators Allen, De Len, Hertzberg, Lara, Portantino, and SternMay 16, 2018

Introduced by Senators Allen, De Len, Hertzberg, Lara, Portantino, and Stern
May 16, 2018

Relative to the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 112, Allen. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, This year marks the 40th anniversary of the establishment of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area, which was formed after local residents organized to take action to preserve open-space and recreational lands in the Santa Monica Mountains and protect those lands from uncontrolled development; and 

WHEREAS, Congressman Anthony C. Beilenson introduced federal legislation to establish the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area following a concerted local campaign; and 

WHEREAS, In 1978, the United States Congress established the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area to be managed by the National Park Service in partnership with state and local governments; and 

WHEREAS, Thirty years ago, the Santa Monica Mountains Fund was created by the Santa Monica Mountains Parklands Association formed by concerned citizens to represent the interests of the public in the development of parklands and recreational opportunities in the Santa Monica Mountains, and to provide the public with an opportunity to contribute to programs that protect lands in the Santa Monica Mountains; and 

WHEREAS, The Santa Monica Mountains Fund has provided financial support for a variety of interesting programs in the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area, including wildlife preservation, mountain lion protection, and educational presentations, and funding for many hiking, biking, and recreational opportunities; and 

WHEREAS, The staff of the Santa Monica Mountains Fund continues to work in close partnership with federal and state park agencies that operate in the Santa Monica Mountains, and the fund sponsors scientific research and student internships that contribute to the success of projects to preserve and enhance open-space land and wildlife in the Santa Monica Mountains; and 

WHEREAS, The preservation of lands in the Santa Monica Mountains could not have been accomplished without the collaborative effort and actions of members of the local community who worked together to protect mountain lands; and 

WHEREAS, This year the people of California will celebrate 40 years since the formation of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area and focus on the future as we look ahead to the next generation of park stewards who will be charged with preserving and enhancing valuable natural resources and lands in the Santa Monica Mountains; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved, by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes 2018 as the 40th anniversary of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area and urges all involved public agencies and the local community to continue to work collaboratively on the successful management of the recreation area for the perpetual use and enjoyment of the public; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.