California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR18 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/23/2017

                    Enrolled  February 23, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  February 23, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 18Introduced by Senator CannellaFebruary 08, 2017 Relative to Engineers Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 18, Cannella. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The week of February 19, 2017, to February 25, 2017, is being observed by state and national engineering organizations as Engineers Week, during which time a number of observances will take place in California; andWHEREAS, Engineers Week is celebrating its 66th anniversary with the theme, Engineers Dream Big; and WHEREAS, Engineers Week promotes recognition among parents, teachers, and students of the importance of a technical education and a high level of math, science, and technology literacy, and motivates youth to pursue engineering careers and participate in a diverse and vigorous engineering workforce; and WHEREAS, California leads the world in science, technology, engineering and math (STEM) education, inspiring and preparing all of its students to seize the opportunities of the global society through innovation, inquiry, collaboration, and creative problem solving; and WHEREAS, According to the National Society of Professional Engineers, there are more than 2,000,000 practicing engineers in the United States, and it is estimated by the United States Department of Labor (Bureau of Labor Statistics) that there are over 328,000 practicing engineers in the State of California; andWHEREAS, Engineers work drives our economy, and many experts predict that the United States needs to produce more engineers in order to meet future demand and to stay competitive in the global marketplace; and WHEREAS, Engineers practice in a number of important specialties, including civil, mechanical, electrical, structural, geotechnical, chemical, control systems, fire protection, nuclear, industrial petroleum, metallurgical, agricultural, and traffic, and through these special disciplines a complete range of engineering services is provided to both the private and public sectors in California; andWHEREAS, Professional engineers are leaders in the development of more efficient, environmentally sustainable, technologically advanced designs relating to water quality, sewage treatment, sanitary engineering, structural integrity of buildings and bridges, seismic safety, cleanup of hazardous waste and toxic sites, and public transportation, including highways, rail, waterways, and airports; andWHEREAS, Californias engineers apply their unique knowledge and skill to help communities grow, thrive, remain safe, and are truly dedicated to building a better California; andWHEREAS, It is appropriate at this time to recognize the contributions of engineering professionals to the betterment of humankind; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That in recognition of the services bestowed upon the citizens of the State of California by engineers, the Senate hereby recognizes the week of February 19, 2017, to February 25, 2017, as Engineers Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  February 23, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  February 23, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 18Introduced by Senator CannellaFebruary 08, 2017 Relative to Engineers Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 18, Cannella. Digest Key

 Enrolled  February 23, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  February 23, 2017

Enrolled  February 23, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  February 23, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 18

Introduced by Senator CannellaFebruary 08, 2017

Introduced by Senator Cannella
February 08, 2017

 Relative to Engineers Week 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 18, Cannella. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The week of February 19, 2017, to February 25, 2017, is being observed by state and national engineering organizations as Engineers Week, during which time a number of observances will take place in California; and

WHEREAS, Engineers Week is celebrating its 66th anniversary with the theme, Engineers Dream Big; and 

WHEREAS, Engineers Week promotes recognition among parents, teachers, and students of the importance of a technical education and a high level of math, science, and technology literacy, and motivates youth to pursue engineering careers and participate in a diverse and vigorous engineering workforce; and 

WHEREAS, California leads the world in science, technology, engineering and math (STEM) education, inspiring and preparing all of its students to seize the opportunities of the global society through innovation, inquiry, collaboration, and creative problem solving; and 

WHEREAS, According to the National Society of Professional Engineers, there are more than 2,000,000 practicing engineers in the United States, and it is estimated by the United States Department of Labor (Bureau of Labor Statistics) that there are over 328,000 practicing engineers in the State of California; and

WHEREAS, Engineers work drives our economy, and many experts predict that the United States needs to produce more engineers in order to meet future demand and to stay competitive in the global marketplace; and 

WHEREAS, Engineers practice in a number of important specialties, including civil, mechanical, electrical, structural, geotechnical, chemical, control systems, fire protection, nuclear, industrial petroleum, metallurgical, agricultural, and traffic, and through these special disciplines a complete range of engineering services is provided to both the private and public sectors in California; and

WHEREAS, Professional engineers are leaders in the development of more efficient, environmentally sustainable, technologically advanced designs relating to water quality, sewage treatment, sanitary engineering, structural integrity of buildings and bridges, seismic safety, cleanup of hazardous waste and toxic sites, and public transportation, including highways, rail, waterways, and airports; and

WHEREAS, Californias engineers apply their unique knowledge and skill to help communities grow, thrive, remain safe, and are truly dedicated to building a better California; and

WHEREAS, It is appropriate at this time to recognize the contributions of engineering professionals to the betterment of humankind; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That in recognition of the services bestowed upon the citizens of the State of California by engineers, the Senate hereby recognizes the week of February 19, 2017, to February 25, 2017, as Engineers Week; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.