California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR81 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/09/2018

                    Enrolled  February 09, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  February 08, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 81Introduced by Senators Mitchell, Atkins, Bates, Fuller, Galgiani, Jackson, Leyva, Nguyen, and SkinnerFebruary 06, 2018 Relative to Women and Girls in Science Day in CaliforniaLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 81, Mitchell. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, On February 17, 2016, the United Nations declared February 11 as International Day of Women and Girls in Science; andWHEREAS, Seventy four percent of high school girls across the country are interested in the fields and subjects of science, technology, engineering, and math (STEM); andWHEREAS, Women account for about only 20 percent of the bachelors degrees in engineering, computer science, and physics; andWHEREAS, Knowledge within the field of science promotes inventiveness, discovery, and efficiency in the way things are done, while also opening up new job and economic opportunities; andWHEREAS, Boosting the number of women in STEM fields would expand our nations pool of workers, educators, and innovators for the future, bring a new dimension to the workforce, and potentially tackle problems that have been overlooked in the past; andWHEREAS, STEM jobs are high-quality, knowledge-intensive jobs that lead to innovation, discovery, and new technologies that produce as much as 85 percent of the growth in the United States economy; andWHEREAS, The negative perception that women and girls are ineffective in math and science can have inhibiting developmental effects and detrimental consequences; andWHEREAS, By reinforcing the idea that women and girls can and do perform equally well in math and science as men and boys, we can help to strengthen their confidence and performance in math and science-related courses and fields; andWHEREAS, Women and girls should be given an equal opportunity to engage and thrive within the fields and subjects of math and science; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate calls upon all citizens and community organizations to support the observance of International Day of Women and Girls in Science by encouraging and celebrating women, girls, and those that identify as such, in STEM fields; and be it furtherResolved, That the Senate declares February 11, 2018, as Women and Girls in Science Day in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate provide copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  February 09, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  February 08, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 81Introduced by Senators Mitchell, Atkins, Bates, Fuller, Galgiani, Jackson, Leyva, Nguyen, and SkinnerFebruary 06, 2018 Relative to Women and Girls in Science Day in CaliforniaLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 81, Mitchell. Digest Key

 Enrolled  February 09, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  February 08, 2018

Enrolled  February 09, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  February 08, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 81

Introduced by Senators Mitchell, Atkins, Bates, Fuller, Galgiani, Jackson, Leyva, Nguyen, and SkinnerFebruary 06, 2018

Introduced by Senators Mitchell, Atkins, Bates, Fuller, Galgiani, Jackson, Leyva, Nguyen, and Skinner
February 06, 2018

 Relative to Women and Girls in Science Day in California

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 81, Mitchell. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, On February 17, 2016, the United Nations declared February 11 as International Day of Women and Girls in Science; and

WHEREAS, Seventy four percent of high school girls across the country are interested in the fields and subjects of science, technology, engineering, and math (STEM); and

WHEREAS, Women account for about only 20 percent of the bachelors degrees in engineering, computer science, and physics; and

WHEREAS, Knowledge within the field of science promotes inventiveness, discovery, and efficiency in the way things are done, while also opening up new job and economic opportunities; and

WHEREAS, Boosting the number of women in STEM fields would expand our nations pool of workers, educators, and innovators for the future, bring a new dimension to the workforce, and potentially tackle problems that have been overlooked in the past; and

WHEREAS, STEM jobs are high-quality, knowledge-intensive jobs that lead to innovation, discovery, and new technologies that produce as much as 85 percent of the growth in the United States economy; and

WHEREAS, The negative perception that women and girls are ineffective in math and science can have inhibiting developmental effects and detrimental consequences; and

WHEREAS, By reinforcing the idea that women and girls can and do perform equally well in math and science as men and boys, we can help to strengthen their confidence and performance in math and science-related courses and fields; and

WHEREAS, Women and girls should be given an equal opportunity to engage and thrive within the fields and subjects of math and science; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate calls upon all citizens and community organizations to support the observance of International Day of Women and Girls in Science by encouraging and celebrating women, girls, and those that identify as such, in STEM fields; and be it further

Resolved, That the Senate declares February 11, 2018, as Women and Girls in Science Day in California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate provide copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.