California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1013 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/12/2019

                    Amended IN  Senate  June 12, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  May 22, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  April 08, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1013Introduced by Assembly Member ObernolteFebruary 21, 2019 An act to add Section 11000.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1013, as amended, Obernolte. State agencies: grant applications.Existing law authorizes various state agencies to award grant money for various purposes.This bill would prohibit a state agency from selecting as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person, as those terms are defined, that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 11000.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:11000.5. (a) A state agency shall not select as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency.(b) For purposes of this section, person shall have the same meaning as defined in Section 6252.(c) For purposes of this section, organization does not include a public agency as defined in Section 6252. 6252 or an entity of the federal government.

 Amended IN  Senate  June 12, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  May 22, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  April 08, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1013Introduced by Assembly Member ObernolteFebruary 21, 2019 An act to add Section 11000.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1013, as amended, Obernolte. State agencies: grant applications.Existing law authorizes various state agencies to award grant money for various purposes.This bill would prohibit a state agency from selecting as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person, as those terms are defined, that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Amended IN  Senate  June 12, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  May 22, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  April 08, 2019

Amended IN  Senate  June 12, 2019
Amended IN  Senate  May 22, 2019
Amended IN  Assembly  April 08, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 1013

Introduced by Assembly Member ObernolteFebruary 21, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Obernolte
February 21, 2019

 An act to add Section 11000.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1013, as amended, Obernolte. State agencies: grant applications.

Existing law authorizes various state agencies to award grant money for various purposes.This bill would prohibit a state agency from selecting as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person, as those terms are defined, that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency. 

Existing law authorizes various state agencies to award grant money for various purposes.

This bill would prohibit a state agency from selecting as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person, as those terms are defined, that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency. 

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 11000.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:11000.5. (a) A state agency shall not select as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency.(b) For purposes of this section, person shall have the same meaning as defined in Section 6252.(c) For purposes of this section, organization does not include a public agency as defined in Section 6252. 6252 or an entity of the federal government.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 11000.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:11000.5. (a) A state agency shall not select as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency.(b) For purposes of this section, person shall have the same meaning as defined in Section 6252.(c) For purposes of this section, organization does not include a public agency as defined in Section 6252. 6252 or an entity of the federal government.

SECTION 1. Section 11000.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

11000.5. (a) A state agency shall not select as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency.(b) For purposes of this section, person shall have the same meaning as defined in Section 6252.(c) For purposes of this section, organization does not include a public agency as defined in Section 6252. 6252 or an entity of the federal government.

11000.5. (a) A state agency shall not select as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency.(b) For purposes of this section, person shall have the same meaning as defined in Section 6252.(c) For purposes of this section, organization does not include a public agency as defined in Section 6252. 6252 or an entity of the federal government.

11000.5. (a) A state agency shall not select as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency.(b) For purposes of this section, person shall have the same meaning as defined in Section 6252.(c) For purposes of this section, organization does not include a public agency as defined in Section 6252. 6252 or an entity of the federal government.



11000.5. (a) A state agency shall not select as an evaluator of a grant application a person who, within the five-year period preceding receipt of that application, was a representative, member, or staff member of an organization or person that is applying to receive grant funding from that state agency.

(b) For purposes of this section, person shall have the same meaning as defined in Section 6252.

(c) For purposes of this section, organization does not include a public agency as defined in Section 6252. 6252 or an entity of the federal government.