California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1208 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/21/2019

                    CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1208Introduced by Assembly Member TingFebruary 21, 2019 An act relating to energy storage. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1208, as introduced, Ting. Energy storage systems. Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission has regulatory authority over public utilities, including electrical corporations. Existing law requires the commission to open a proceeding to determine appropriate targets, if any, for each load-serving entity, as defined, to procure viable and cost-effective energy storage systems to be achieved by December 31, 2015, and December 31, 2020. If determined to be appropriate, the commission is required to adopt the procurement targets by October 1, 2013, and to reevaluate the determinations not less often than once every 3 years.This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation related to energy storage systems.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation related to energy storage systems.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1208Introduced by Assembly Member TingFebruary 21, 2019 An act relating to energy storage. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1208, as introduced, Ting. Energy storage systems. Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission has regulatory authority over public utilities, including electrical corporations. Existing law requires the commission to open a proceeding to determine appropriate targets, if any, for each load-serving entity, as defined, to procure viable and cost-effective energy storage systems to be achieved by December 31, 2015, and December 31, 2020. If determined to be appropriate, the commission is required to adopt the procurement targets by October 1, 2013, and to reevaluate the determinations not less often than once every 3 years.This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation related to energy storage systems.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 1208

Introduced by Assembly Member TingFebruary 21, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Ting
February 21, 2019

 An act relating to energy storage. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1208, as introduced, Ting. Energy storage systems.

 Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission has regulatory authority over public utilities, including electrical corporations. Existing law requires the commission to open a proceeding to determine appropriate targets, if any, for each load-serving entity, as defined, to procure viable and cost-effective energy storage systems to be achieved by December 31, 2015, and December 31, 2020. If determined to be appropriate, the commission is required to adopt the procurement targets by October 1, 2013, and to reevaluate the determinations not less often than once every 3 years.This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation related to energy storage systems.

 Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission has regulatory authority over public utilities, including electrical corporations. Existing law requires the commission to open a proceeding to determine appropriate targets, if any, for each load-serving entity, as defined, to procure viable and cost-effective energy storage systems to be achieved by December 31, 2015, and December 31, 2020. If determined to be appropriate, the commission is required to adopt the procurement targets by October 1, 2013, and to reevaluate the determinations not less often than once every 3 years.

This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation related to energy storage systems.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation related to energy storage systems.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation related to energy storage systems.

SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation related to energy storage systems.

SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation related to energy storage systems.

### SECTION 1.