California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1733 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/22/2019

                    CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1733Introduced by Assembly Member SalasFebruary 22, 2019 An act relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1733, as introduced, Salas. California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program.The California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program requires the Public Utilities Commission to establish a renewables portfolio standard requiring all retail sellers, as defined, to procure a minimum quantity of electricity products from eligible renewable energy resources, as defined, so that the total kilowatthours of those products sold to their retail end-use customers achieves 25% of retail sales by December 31, 2016, 33% by December 31, 2020, 44% by December 31, 2024, 52% by December 31, 2027, and 60% by December 31, 2030. The program additionally requires each local publicly owned electric utility to procure a minimum quantity of electricity products from eligible renewable energy resources to achieve the procurement requirements established by the program.This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that relates to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that relates to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program (Article 16 (commencing with Section 399.11) of Chapter 2.3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code).

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1733Introduced by Assembly Member SalasFebruary 22, 2019 An act relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1733, as introduced, Salas. California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program.The California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program requires the Public Utilities Commission to establish a renewables portfolio standard requiring all retail sellers, as defined, to procure a minimum quantity of electricity products from eligible renewable energy resources, as defined, so that the total kilowatthours of those products sold to their retail end-use customers achieves 25% of retail sales by December 31, 2016, 33% by December 31, 2020, 44% by December 31, 2024, 52% by December 31, 2027, and 60% by December 31, 2030. The program additionally requires each local publicly owned electric utility to procure a minimum quantity of electricity products from eligible renewable energy resources to achieve the procurement requirements established by the program.This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that relates to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 1733

Introduced by Assembly Member SalasFebruary 22, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Salas
February 22, 2019

 An act relating to energy. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1733, as introduced, Salas. California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program.

The California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program requires the Public Utilities Commission to establish a renewables portfolio standard requiring all retail sellers, as defined, to procure a minimum quantity of electricity products from eligible renewable energy resources, as defined, so that the total kilowatthours of those products sold to their retail end-use customers achieves 25% of retail sales by December 31, 2016, 33% by December 31, 2020, 44% by December 31, 2024, 52% by December 31, 2027, and 60% by December 31, 2030. The program additionally requires each local publicly owned electric utility to procure a minimum quantity of electricity products from eligible renewable energy resources to achieve the procurement requirements established by the program.This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that relates to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program.

The California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program requires the Public Utilities Commission to establish a renewables portfolio standard requiring all retail sellers, as defined, to procure a minimum quantity of electricity products from eligible renewable energy resources, as defined, so that the total kilowatthours of those products sold to their retail end-use customers achieves 25% of retail sales by December 31, 2016, 33% by December 31, 2020, 44% by December 31, 2024, 52% by December 31, 2027, and 60% by December 31, 2030. The program additionally requires each local publicly owned electric utility to procure a minimum quantity of electricity products from eligible renewable energy resources to achieve the procurement requirements established by the program.

This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that relates to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that relates to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program (Article 16 (commencing with Section 399.11) of Chapter 2.3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code).

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that relates to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program (Article 16 (commencing with Section 399.11) of Chapter 2.3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code).

SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that relates to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program (Article 16 (commencing with Section 399.11) of Chapter 2.3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code).

SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that relates to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program (Article 16 (commencing with Section 399.11) of Chapter 2.3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code).

### SECTION 1.