California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2107 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/31/2020

                    Enrolled  August 31, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2020 Passed IN  Assembly  May 26, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2107Introduced by Assembly Members Rodriguez and GrayFebruary 06, 2020 An act to amend Section 53839 of the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2107, Rodriguez. Local government: securitized limited obligation notes.Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 53839 of the Government Code is amended to read:53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

 Enrolled  August 31, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2020 Passed IN  Assembly  May 26, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2107Introduced by Assembly Members Rodriguez and GrayFebruary 06, 2020 An act to amend Section 53839 of the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2107, Rodriguez. Local government: securitized limited obligation notes.Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 31, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2020 Passed IN  Assembly  May 26, 2020

Enrolled  August 31, 2020
Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2020
Passed IN  Assembly  May 26, 2020

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 2107

Introduced by Assembly Members Rodriguez and GrayFebruary 06, 2020

Introduced by Assembly Members Rodriguez and Gray
February 06, 2020

 An act to amend Section 53839 of the Government Code, relating to local government. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 2107, Rodriguez. Local government: securitized limited obligation notes.

Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.

Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.

This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 53839 of the Government Code is amended to read:53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 53839 of the Government Code is amended to read:53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

SECTION 1. Section 53839 of the Government Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.

53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.



53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.