California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2821 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/20/2020

                    Amended IN  Senate  August 20, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2821Introduced by Assembly Member NazarianFebruary 20, 2020 An act to amend Section 103870.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2821, as amended, Nazarian. Richard Paul Hemann Parkinsons Disease Program.Existing law establishes the Richard Paul Hemann Parkinsons Disease Program, which, among other things, requires the State Department of Public Health to collect data on the incidence of Parkinsons disease in California, as specified. Existing law requires a hospital, facility, physician and surgeon, or other health care provider diagnosing or providing treatment to Parkinsons disease patients to report each case of Parkinsons disease to the department, as prescribed. Existing law conditions the implementation of the program on the availability of funds and repeals the program on January 1, 2021.This bill would extend the program until January 1, 2026. 2022.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 103870.2 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:103870.2. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2026, 2022, and as of that date is repealed.

 Amended IN  Senate  August 20, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2821Introduced by Assembly Member NazarianFebruary 20, 2020 An act to amend Section 103870.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2821, as amended, Nazarian. Richard Paul Hemann Parkinsons Disease Program.Existing law establishes the Richard Paul Hemann Parkinsons Disease Program, which, among other things, requires the State Department of Public Health to collect data on the incidence of Parkinsons disease in California, as specified. Existing law requires a hospital, facility, physician and surgeon, or other health care provider diagnosing or providing treatment to Parkinsons disease patients to report each case of Parkinsons disease to the department, as prescribed. Existing law conditions the implementation of the program on the availability of funds and repeals the program on January 1, 2021.This bill would extend the program until January 1, 2026. 2022.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Amended IN  Senate  August 20, 2020

Amended IN  Senate  August 20, 2020

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 2821

Introduced by Assembly Member NazarianFebruary 20, 2020

Introduced by Assembly Member Nazarian
February 20, 2020

 An act to amend Section 103870.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 2821, as amended, Nazarian. Richard Paul Hemann Parkinsons Disease Program.

Existing law establishes the Richard Paul Hemann Parkinsons Disease Program, which, among other things, requires the State Department of Public Health to collect data on the incidence of Parkinsons disease in California, as specified. Existing law requires a hospital, facility, physician and surgeon, or other health care provider diagnosing or providing treatment to Parkinsons disease patients to report each case of Parkinsons disease to the department, as prescribed. Existing law conditions the implementation of the program on the availability of funds and repeals the program on January 1, 2021.This bill would extend the program until January 1, 2026. 2022.

Existing law establishes the Richard Paul Hemann Parkinsons Disease Program, which, among other things, requires the State Department of Public Health to collect data on the incidence of Parkinsons disease in California, as specified. Existing law requires a hospital, facility, physician and surgeon, or other health care provider diagnosing or providing treatment to Parkinsons disease patients to report each case of Parkinsons disease to the department, as prescribed. Existing law conditions the implementation of the program on the availability of funds and repeals the program on January 1, 2021.

This bill would extend the program until January 1, 2026. 2022.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 103870.2 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:103870.2. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2026, 2022, and as of that date is repealed.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 103870.2 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:103870.2. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2026, 2022, and as of that date is repealed.

SECTION 1. Section 103870.2 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

103870.2. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2026, 2022, and as of that date is repealed.

103870.2. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2026, 2022, and as of that date is repealed.

103870.2. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2026, 2022, and as of that date is repealed.



103870.2. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2026, 2022, and as of that date is repealed.