California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB634 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/03/2019

                    Enrolled  July 03, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  July 01, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 09, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 634Introduced by Assembly Member SalasFebruary 15, 2019 An act to add Section 101.15 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 634, Salas. Traffic control devices: roundabouts: memorial and dedication signs.Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 101.15 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read:101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.

 Enrolled  July 03, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  July 01, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 09, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 634Introduced by Assembly Member SalasFebruary 15, 2019 An act to add Section 101.15 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 634, Salas. Traffic control devices: roundabouts: memorial and dedication signs.Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  July 03, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  July 01, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 09, 2019

Enrolled  July 03, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  July 01, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  May 09, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 634

Introduced by Assembly Member SalasFebruary 15, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Salas
February 15, 2019

 An act to add Section 101.15 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 634, Salas. Traffic control devices: roundabouts: memorial and dedication signs.

Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.

Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.

The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.

This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 101.15 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read:101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 101.15 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read:101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.

SECTION 1. Section 101.15 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.

101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.

101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.



101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.