Enrolled June 12, 2020 Passed IN Senate June 11, 2020 Passed IN Assembly February 14, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 153Introduced by Assembly Member Luz Rivas(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Chu, Obernolte, and Quirk)January 27, 2020 Relative to Engineers Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 153, Luz Rivas. Engineers Week.This measure would recognize the week of February 16, 2020, to February 22, 2020, as Engineers Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The week of February 16, 2020, to February 22, 2020, is being observed by state and national engineering organizations as Engineers Week, during which time a number of observances will take place in California; and WHEREAS, Engineers Week is celebrating its 69th anniversary with the theme Engineers: Pioneers of Progress; and WHEREAS, Engineers Week promotes recognition among parents, teachers, and students of the importance of a technical education and a high level of mathematics, science, and technology literacy, and motivates youth to pursue engineering careers and participate in a diverse and vigorous engineering workforce; and WHEREAS, California leads the world in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) education, inspiring and preparing all of its students to seize the opportunities of the global society through innovation, inquiry, collaboration, and creative problem solving; and WHEREAS, According to the United States Department of Labor, Bureau of Labor Statistics, there are more than 1,700,000 practicing engineers in the United States, and according to the Board for Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, and Geologists, there are over 90,000 active, licensed engineers in the State of California; andWHEREAS, Engineers work drives our economy, and many experts predict that the United States needs to produce more engineers in order to meet future demand and to stay competitive in the global marketplace; andWHEREAS, Engineers practice in a number of important specialties, including civil, mechanical, electrical, structural, geotechnical, chemical, control systems, fire protection, nuclear, industrial petroleum, metallurgical, agricultural, and traffic, and through these special disciplines, a complete range of engineering services is provided to both the private and public sectors in California; andWHEREAS, Professional engineers are leaders in the development of more efficient, environmentally sustainable, technologically advanced designs relating to water quality, sewage treatment, sanitary engineering, flood control, structural integrity of buildings and bridges, seismic safety, cleanup of hazardous waste and toxic sites, and public transportation, including highways, rail, waterways, and airports; andWHEREAS, Californias engineers apply their unique knowledge and skill to help communities grow, thrive, and remain safe, and are truly dedicated to building a better California; andWHEREAS, It is appropriate at this time to recognize the contributions of engineering professionals to the betterment of humankind; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That in recognition of the services bestowed upon the citizens of the State of California by engineers, the Legislature hereby recognizes the week of February 16, 2020, to February 22, 2020, as Engineers Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Enrolled June 12, 2020 Passed IN Senate June 11, 2020 Passed IN Assembly February 14, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 153Introduced by Assembly Member Luz Rivas(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Chu, Obernolte, and Quirk)January 27, 2020 Relative to Engineers Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 153, Luz Rivas. Engineers Week.This measure would recognize the week of February 16, 2020, to February 22, 2020, as Engineers Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Enrolled June 12, 2020 Passed IN Senate June 11, 2020 Passed IN Assembly February 14, 2020 Enrolled June 12, 2020 Passed IN Senate June 11, 2020 Passed IN Assembly February 14, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 153 Introduced by Assembly Member Luz Rivas(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Chu, Obernolte, and Quirk)January 27, 2020 Introduced by Assembly Member Luz Rivas(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Chu, Obernolte, and Quirk) January 27, 2020 Relative to Engineers Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 153, Luz Rivas. Engineers Week. This measure would recognize the week of February 16, 2020, to February 22, 2020, as Engineers Week. This measure would recognize the week of February 16, 2020, to February 22, 2020, as Engineers Week. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, The week of February 16, 2020, to February 22, 2020, is being observed by state and national engineering organizations as Engineers Week, during which time a number of observances will take place in California; and WHEREAS, Engineers Week is celebrating its 69th anniversary with the theme Engineers: Pioneers of Progress; and WHEREAS, Engineers Week promotes recognition among parents, teachers, and students of the importance of a technical education and a high level of mathematics, science, and technology literacy, and motivates youth to pursue engineering careers and participate in a diverse and vigorous engineering workforce; and WHEREAS, California leads the world in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) education, inspiring and preparing all of its students to seize the opportunities of the global society through innovation, inquiry, collaboration, and creative problem solving; and WHEREAS, According to the United States Department of Labor, Bureau of Labor Statistics, there are more than 1,700,000 practicing engineers in the United States, and according to the Board for Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, and Geologists, there are over 90,000 active, licensed engineers in the State of California; and WHEREAS, Engineers work drives our economy, and many experts predict that the United States needs to produce more engineers in order to meet future demand and to stay competitive in the global marketplace; and WHEREAS, Engineers practice in a number of important specialties, including civil, mechanical, electrical, structural, geotechnical, chemical, control systems, fire protection, nuclear, industrial petroleum, metallurgical, agricultural, and traffic, and through these special disciplines, a complete range of engineering services is provided to both the private and public sectors in California; and WHEREAS, Professional engineers are leaders in the development of more efficient, environmentally sustainable, technologically advanced designs relating to water quality, sewage treatment, sanitary engineering, flood control, structural integrity of buildings and bridges, seismic safety, cleanup of hazardous waste and toxic sites, and public transportation, including highways, rail, waterways, and airports; and WHEREAS, Californias engineers apply their unique knowledge and skill to help communities grow, thrive, and remain safe, and are truly dedicated to building a better California; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate at this time to recognize the contributions of engineering professionals to the betterment of humankind; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That in recognition of the services bestowed upon the citizens of the State of California by engineers, the Legislature hereby recognizes the week of February 16, 2020, to February 22, 2020, as Engineers Week; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.