Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 156 CHAPTER 12Relative to Rosa Parks Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 04, 2020. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 156, Cooper. Rosa Parks Day in California: 20th Anniversary.This measure would memorialize the achievements of Rosa Parks in the Civil Rights Movement and would commemorate the 20th Anniversary of Rosa Parks Day in California on February 4, 2020.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Rosa Parks was born on February 4, 1913, in Tuskegee, Alabama, the first child of James and Leona (Edwards) McCauley; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks attended the Industrial School for Girls in Montgomery, Alabama, and a secondary education led by the Alabama State Teachers College for Negroes. Parks left school in her senior year to attend to her sick grandmother and mother in rural Alabama; and WHEREAS, Rosa Louise McCauley married Raymond Parks on December 18, 1932, and returned to finish her high school degree in 1933. Over time, Parks became increasingly active in Civil Rights issues and joined the Montgomery chapter of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (NAACP) in 1943, serving as the chapters youth leader as well as secretary to then NAACP President E.D. Nixon; and WHEREAS, In September 1944, Rosa Parks boldly investigated the abduction and gang rape of Recy Taylor, a then 24-year-old mother and rural agriculture sharecropper walking home from church. The unprosecuted crime received extensive coverage and brought attention to the history of racial violence, particularly against women in the Deep South. Rosa Parks founded the Committee for Equal Justice for Mrs. Recy Taylor with the support of W.E.B. Du Bois, Mary Church Terrell, and Langston Hughes, among others, but still faltered under the weight of entrenched Alabama bigotry; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks, Patron Saint for the Womens Political Council of Montgomery, Alabama, was arrested on December 1, 1955, for refusing to give up her seat on a bus to a white man, and her stand for equal rights became legendary; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks arrest for refusing to comply with Montgomerys segregation law was the impetus for a boycott of Montgomery buses, led by Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., by approximately 42,000 African Americans for 381 days; and WHEREAS, The Montgomery Bus Boycott was the seminal event of the Civil Rights Movement when the United States Supreme Court ruled on the Browder vs. Gayle (1956) 142 F.Supp. 707 case, that Montgomerys segregation law was unconstitutional, and on December 20, 1956, Montgomery officials were ordered to desegregate buses; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks is honored as the Mother of the Modern Day Civil Rights Movement, because her refusal to surrender her seat in compliance with Montgomerys segregation law inspired the civil rights movement, which has resulted in the breakdown of numerous legal barriers and the lessening of profound discrimination against African Americans in this country; and WHEREAS, The courage and conviction of Rosa Parks laid the foundation for equal rights for all Americans and for the Civil Rights Act of 1964; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks dedicated her life to the cause of human rights and truly embodied the love of humanity and freedom; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature officially remembers celebrating Rosa Parks on her birthday, Friday, February 4, 2000, and on this 20th Anniversary, Tuesday, February 4, 2020, urges all residents to pay homage to this great American woman; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this measure to the author for appropriate distribution. Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 156 CHAPTER 12Relative to Rosa Parks Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 04, 2020. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 156, Cooper. Rosa Parks Day in California: 20th Anniversary.This measure would memorialize the achievements of Rosa Parks in the Civil Rights Movement and would commemorate the 20th Anniversary of Rosa Parks Day in California on February 4, 2020.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 156 CHAPTER 12 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 156 CHAPTER 12 Relative to Rosa Parks Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 04, 2020. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 156, Cooper. Rosa Parks Day in California: 20th Anniversary. This measure would memorialize the achievements of Rosa Parks in the Civil Rights Movement and would commemorate the 20th Anniversary of Rosa Parks Day in California on February 4, 2020. This measure would memorialize the achievements of Rosa Parks in the Civil Rights Movement and would commemorate the 20th Anniversary of Rosa Parks Day in California on February 4, 2020. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, Rosa Parks was born on February 4, 1913, in Tuskegee, Alabama, the first child of James and Leona (Edwards) McCauley; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks attended the Industrial School for Girls in Montgomery, Alabama, and a secondary education led by the Alabama State Teachers College for Negroes. Parks left school in her senior year to attend to her sick grandmother and mother in rural Alabama; and WHEREAS, Rosa Louise McCauley married Raymond Parks on December 18, 1932, and returned to finish her high school degree in 1933. Over time, Parks became increasingly active in Civil Rights issues and joined the Montgomery chapter of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (NAACP) in 1943, serving as the chapters youth leader as well as secretary to then NAACP President E.D. Nixon; and WHEREAS, In September 1944, Rosa Parks boldly investigated the abduction and gang rape of Recy Taylor, a then 24-year-old mother and rural agriculture sharecropper walking home from church. The unprosecuted crime received extensive coverage and brought attention to the history of racial violence, particularly against women in the Deep South. Rosa Parks founded the Committee for Equal Justice for Mrs. Recy Taylor with the support of W.E.B. Du Bois, Mary Church Terrell, and Langston Hughes, among others, but still faltered under the weight of entrenched Alabama bigotry; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks, Patron Saint for the Womens Political Council of Montgomery, Alabama, was arrested on December 1, 1955, for refusing to give up her seat on a bus to a white man, and her stand for equal rights became legendary; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks arrest for refusing to comply with Montgomerys segregation law was the impetus for a boycott of Montgomery buses, led by Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., by approximately 42,000 African Americans for 381 days; and WHEREAS, The Montgomery Bus Boycott was the seminal event of the Civil Rights Movement when the United States Supreme Court ruled on the Browder vs. Gayle (1956) 142 F.Supp. 707 case, that Montgomerys segregation law was unconstitutional, and on December 20, 1956, Montgomery officials were ordered to desegregate buses; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks is honored as the Mother of the Modern Day Civil Rights Movement, because her refusal to surrender her seat in compliance with Montgomerys segregation law inspired the civil rights movement, which has resulted in the breakdown of numerous legal barriers and the lessening of profound discrimination against African Americans in this country; and WHEREAS, The courage and conviction of Rosa Parks laid the foundation for equal rights for all Americans and for the Civil Rights Act of 1964; and WHEREAS, Rosa Parks dedicated her life to the cause of human rights and truly embodied the love of humanity and freedom; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature officially remembers celebrating Rosa Parks on her birthday, Friday, February 4, 2000, and on this 20th Anniversary, Tuesday, February 4, 2020, urges all residents to pay homage to this great American woman; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this measure to the author for appropriate distribution.