California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR16 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/20/2019

                    Enrolled  February 20, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  February 19, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  February 04, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 16Introduced by Assembly Member Chiu(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Bonta, Chau, Chen, Choi, Chu, Diep, Fong, Gloria, Kalra, Low, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, and Ting)(Principal coauthors: Senators Chang and Pan)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Brough, Burke, Carrillo, Cooper, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)January 23, 2019 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 16, Chiu. Lunar New Year celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, February 5, 2019, marks the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including the United States, and especially California; and WHEREAS, California is home to nearly six million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, IuMien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by over 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, This Lunar New Year is the Year of the Pig and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 5, 2019, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year, the Year of the Pig, and extends best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  February 20, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  February 19, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  February 04, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 16Introduced by Assembly Member Chiu(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Bonta, Chau, Chen, Choi, Chu, Diep, Fong, Gloria, Kalra, Low, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, and Ting)(Principal coauthors: Senators Chang and Pan)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Brough, Burke, Carrillo, Cooper, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)January 23, 2019 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 16, Chiu. Lunar New Year celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  February 20, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  February 19, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  February 04, 2019

Enrolled  February 20, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  February 19, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  February 04, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 16

Introduced by Assembly Member Chiu(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Bonta, Chau, Chen, Choi, Chu, Diep, Fong, Gloria, Kalra, Low, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, and Ting)(Principal coauthors: Senators Chang and Pan)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Brough, Burke, Carrillo, Cooper, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)January 23, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Chiu(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Bonta, Chau, Chen, Choi, Chu, Diep, Fong, Gloria, Kalra, Low, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, and Ting)(Principal coauthors: Senators Chang and Pan)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Brough, Burke, Carrillo, Cooper, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)
January 23, 2019

 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 16, Chiu. Lunar New Year celebration. 

This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration. 

This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration. 

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, February 5, 2019, marks the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including the United States, and especially California; and 

WHEREAS, California is home to nearly six million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, IuMien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; and

WHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; and

WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by over 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; and

WHEREAS, This Lunar New Year is the Year of the Pig and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and start the new year with a clean slate; and

WHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 5, 2019, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year, the Year of the Pig, and extends best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.