California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR46 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/26/2019

                    CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 46Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaJune 26, 2019 Relative to Arirang Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 46, as introduced, Choi. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Arirang is a Korean folk song, often considered as the unofficial national anthem of Korea; andWHEREAS, In December 2012, South Koreas submission of the song to UNESCO was inscribed on the Representative List of the Intangible Cultural Heritage of Humanity program; andWHEREAS, The Orange County Korean Festival Committee is holding its 35th Arirang Festival, from October 3, 2019, through October 6, 2019, in the City of Buena Park; andWHEREAS, The first translation of the songs lyrics into nine languages was performed in December 2013; andWHEREAS, Many versions of the song feature a woman warning a man of the difficulties of crossing a mountain pass in order to dissuade him from leaving her; andWHEREAS, Arirang is one name for the pass, and hence the title of the song; andWHEREAS, Arirang Pass is an imaginary rendezvous for lovers in the land of dreams, although there is a real mountain pass, called Arirang Gogae, outside the Small East Gate of Seoul; andWHEREAS, The heroine of the story from which the Arirang song originated was a fair maiden of Miryang. In fact, she was a modest woman killed by an unrequited lover. But as time went on, the tragic story changed to that of an unrequited lady-love who complained of her unfeeling lover. The tune is sweet and appealing; andWHEREAS, With diligence, fortitude, and an enduring belief in the American dream, Korean immigrants have helped to turn emergent areas within the State of California into thriving and respectable communities, while raising their children to be productive Korean Americans; andWHEREAS, Korean Americans have become an integral part of mainstream American society and have made important contributions as Californians in the fields of finance, technology, law, medicine, education, sports, media, the arts, the military, and government, as well as other areas; andWHEREAS, As the people of Californias Korean American community prepare for a 35th Arirang Festival, they strive to preserve and maintain pride in their own cultural heritage so that they may better contribute to the great State of California, rich with ethnic and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly recognizes October 11, 2019, as Arirang Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 46Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaJune 26, 2019 Relative to Arirang Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 46, as introduced, Choi. Digest Key





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

House Resolution No. 46

Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaJune 26, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva
June 26, 2019

 Relative to Arirang Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

HR 46, as introduced, Choi. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Arirang is a Korean folk song, often considered as the unofficial national anthem of Korea; and

WHEREAS, In December 2012, South Koreas submission of the song to UNESCO was inscribed on the Representative List of the Intangible Cultural Heritage of Humanity program; and

WHEREAS, The Orange County Korean Festival Committee is holding its 35th Arirang Festival, from October 3, 2019, through October 6, 2019, in the City of Buena Park; and

WHEREAS, The first translation of the songs lyrics into nine languages was performed in December 2013; and

WHEREAS, Many versions of the song feature a woman warning a man of the difficulties of crossing a mountain pass in order to dissuade him from leaving her; and

WHEREAS, Arirang is one name for the pass, and hence the title of the song; and

WHEREAS, Arirang Pass is an imaginary rendezvous for lovers in the land of dreams, although there is a real mountain pass, called Arirang Gogae, outside the Small East Gate of Seoul; and

WHEREAS, The heroine of the story from which the Arirang song originated was a fair maiden of Miryang. In fact, she was a modest woman killed by an unrequited lover. But as time went on, the tragic story changed to that of an unrequited lady-love who complained of her unfeeling lover. The tune is sweet and appealing; and

WHEREAS, With diligence, fortitude, and an enduring belief in the American dream, Korean immigrants have helped to turn emergent areas within the State of California into thriving and respectable communities, while raising their children to be productive Korean Americans; and

WHEREAS, Korean Americans have become an integral part of mainstream American society and have made important contributions as Californians in the fields of finance, technology, law, medicine, education, sports, media, the arts, the military, and government, as well as other areas; and

WHEREAS, As the people of Californias Korean American community prepare for a 35th Arirang Festival, they strive to preserve and maintain pride in their own cultural heritage so that they may better contribute to the great State of California, rich with ethnic and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly recognizes October 11, 2019, as Arirang Day; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.