California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR92 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/16/2020

                    CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 92Introduced by Assembly Member Berman(Coauthors: Assembly Members Rendon and Santiago)March 16, 2020 Relative to the 2020 Census. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 92, as introduced, Berman. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The United States Census Bureau is required by Congress, pursuant to its authority under Section 2 of Article I of the United States Constitution, to conduct an accurate count of the population every 10 years; andWHEREAS, The next enumeration is scheduled to commence March 12, 2020, and will be the first to rely heavily on online self-responses; andWHEREAS, The primary and perpetual challenge facing the United States Census Bureau is the historic undercount of certain population groups; andWHEREAS, That challenge is amplified in California, given the size of the state and the diversity of communities; andWHEREAS, These communities and populations are at risk of being undercounted in the 2020 Decennial Census because they possess characteristics or live in regions that make them hard to count; andWHEREAS, Many in the Golden State lack access to the internet, which presents great challenges to online census participation; andWHEREAS, A complete and accurate count of Californias population is essential; andWHEREAS, The data collected by the decennial census determines the number of seats each state has in the House of Representatives and is used to distribute billions of dollars in federal funds to state and local governments; andWHEREAS, Census data is also used in the redistricting of state legislatures, county boards of supervisors, and city councils; andWHEREAS, Californias leaders have dedicated a historic amount of funding and resources to ensure the hardest-to-count Californians are reached; andWHEREAS, This commitment of resources directly supports trusted messengerstribal, city, county, and state governments, community-based organizations, educational institutions, and many more organizations; andWHEREAS, The United States Census Bureau faces several challenges with the 2020 Decennial Census, including rapidly changing use of technology, declining response rates, an increasingly diverse and mobile population, and vast misinformation; andWHEREAS, California has been coordinating outreach and engagement efforts since 2018 by establishing the California Complete Count Committee and the California Complete Count - Census 2020 Office; andWHEREAS, The Legislature, in partnership with the California Complete Count - Census 2020 Office, the Secretary of State, and other local and state government agencies, is committed to robust outreach and communication strategies, focusing on reaching the hardest-to-count individuals; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly recognizes the importance of the 2020 Decennial Census and supports helping to ensure a complete, fair, and accurate count of all Californians; and be it furtherResolved, That the week of March 30, 2020, to April 5, 2020, inclusive, is recognized as Census 2020 Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 92Introduced by Assembly Member Berman(Coauthors: Assembly Members Rendon and Santiago)March 16, 2020 Relative to the 2020 Census. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 92, as introduced, Berman. Digest Key





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 House Resolution 

No. 92

Introduced by Assembly Member Berman(Coauthors: Assembly Members Rendon and Santiago)March 16, 2020

Introduced by Assembly Member Berman(Coauthors: Assembly Members Rendon and Santiago)
March 16, 2020

 Relative to the 2020 Census. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

HR 92, as introduced, Berman. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The United States Census Bureau is required by Congress, pursuant to its authority under Section 2 of Article I of the United States Constitution, to conduct an accurate count of the population every 10 years; and

WHEREAS, The next enumeration is scheduled to commence March 12, 2020, and will be the first to rely heavily on online self-responses; and

WHEREAS, The primary and perpetual challenge facing the United States Census Bureau is the historic undercount of certain population groups; and

WHEREAS, That challenge is amplified in California, given the size of the state and the diversity of communities; and

WHEREAS, These communities and populations are at risk of being undercounted in the 2020 Decennial Census because they possess characteristics or live in regions that make them hard to count; and

WHEREAS, Many in the Golden State lack access to the internet, which presents great challenges to online census participation; and

WHEREAS, A complete and accurate count of Californias population is essential; and

WHEREAS, The data collected by the decennial census determines the number of seats each state has in the House of Representatives and is used to distribute billions of dollars in federal funds to state and local governments; and

WHEREAS, Census data is also used in the redistricting of state legislatures, county boards of supervisors, and city councils; and

WHEREAS, Californias leaders have dedicated a historic amount of funding and resources to ensure the hardest-to-count Californians are reached; and

WHEREAS, This commitment of resources directly supports trusted messengerstribal, city, county, and state governments, community-based organizations, educational institutions, and many more organizations; and

WHEREAS, The United States Census Bureau faces several challenges with the 2020 Decennial Census, including rapidly changing use of technology, declining response rates, an increasingly diverse and mobile population, and vast misinformation; and

WHEREAS, California has been coordinating outreach and engagement efforts since 2018 by establishing the California Complete Count Committee and the California Complete Count - Census 2020 Office; and

WHEREAS, The Legislature, in partnership with the California Complete Count - Census 2020 Office, the Secretary of State, and other local and state government agencies, is committed to robust outreach and communication strategies, focusing on reaching the hardest-to-count individuals; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly recognizes the importance of the 2020 Decennial Census and supports helping to ensure a complete, fair, and accurate count of all Californians; and be it further

Resolved, That the week of March 30, 2020, to April 5, 2020, inclusive, is recognized as Census 2020 Week in California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.