California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1307 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/04/2020

                    Enrolled  September 04, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  June 11, 2020 Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1307Introduced by Senator RubioFebruary 21, 2020An act relating to street lighting.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1307, Rubio. Street lighting systems: City of Rosemead.(1) The Street Lighting Act of 1919 provides for an alternative system for making improvements to street lighting systems, as defined. The act authorizes, when, in the opinion of the city council of any city, the public interest or convenience requires, that the city may, among other things, order that any street lighting system be maintained in or along the whole or any part of any one or more of the streets in that city.This bill would, in addition to the Landscaping and Lighting District of the City of Rosemeads existing authority to perform specified maintenance and operations under the Street Lighting Act of 1919, authorize that district to also perform maintenance and make improvements pursuant to the Landscaping and Lighting Act of 1972.(2) This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the City of Rosemead.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. In addition to the districts authority to perform street lighting maintenance and operations as specified in Section 18030 of the Streets and Highways Code, the Landscaping and Lighting District of the City of Rosemead may also perform maintenance and make improvements pursuant to Sections 22525 and 22531 of the Streets and Highways Code.SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special statute is necessary and that a general statute cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique need to perform immediate maintenance and make improvements in the City of Rosemead.

 Enrolled  September 04, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  June 11, 2020 Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1307Introduced by Senator RubioFebruary 21, 2020An act relating to street lighting.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1307, Rubio. Street lighting systems: City of Rosemead.(1) The Street Lighting Act of 1919 provides for an alternative system for making improvements to street lighting systems, as defined. The act authorizes, when, in the opinion of the city council of any city, the public interest or convenience requires, that the city may, among other things, order that any street lighting system be maintained in or along the whole or any part of any one or more of the streets in that city.This bill would, in addition to the Landscaping and Lighting District of the City of Rosemeads existing authority to perform specified maintenance and operations under the Street Lighting Act of 1919, authorize that district to also perform maintenance and make improvements pursuant to the Landscaping and Lighting Act of 1972.(2) This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the City of Rosemead.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 04, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  June 11, 2020 Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2020

Enrolled  September 04, 2020
Passed IN  Senate  June 11, 2020
Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2020

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 1307

Introduced by Senator RubioFebruary 21, 2020

Introduced by Senator Rubio
February 21, 2020

An act relating to street lighting.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 1307, Rubio. Street lighting systems: City of Rosemead.

(1) The Street Lighting Act of 1919 provides for an alternative system for making improvements to street lighting systems, as defined. The act authorizes, when, in the opinion of the city council of any city, the public interest or convenience requires, that the city may, among other things, order that any street lighting system be maintained in or along the whole or any part of any one or more of the streets in that city.This bill would, in addition to the Landscaping and Lighting District of the City of Rosemeads existing authority to perform specified maintenance and operations under the Street Lighting Act of 1919, authorize that district to also perform maintenance and make improvements pursuant to the Landscaping and Lighting Act of 1972.(2) This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the City of Rosemead.

(1) The Street Lighting Act of 1919 provides for an alternative system for making improvements to street lighting systems, as defined. The act authorizes, when, in the opinion of the city council of any city, the public interest or convenience requires, that the city may, among other things, order that any street lighting system be maintained in or along the whole or any part of any one or more of the streets in that city.

This bill would, in addition to the Landscaping and Lighting District of the City of Rosemeads existing authority to perform specified maintenance and operations under the Street Lighting Act of 1919, authorize that district to also perform maintenance and make improvements pursuant to the Landscaping and Lighting Act of 1972.

(2) This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the City of Rosemead.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. In addition to the districts authority to perform street lighting maintenance and operations as specified in Section 18030 of the Streets and Highways Code, the Landscaping and Lighting District of the City of Rosemead may also perform maintenance and make improvements pursuant to Sections 22525 and 22531 of the Streets and Highways Code.SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special statute is necessary and that a general statute cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique need to perform immediate maintenance and make improvements in the City of Rosemead.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. In addition to the districts authority to perform street lighting maintenance and operations as specified in Section 18030 of the Streets and Highways Code, the Landscaping and Lighting District of the City of Rosemead may also perform maintenance and make improvements pursuant to Sections 22525 and 22531 of the Streets and Highways Code.

SECTION 1. In addition to the districts authority to perform street lighting maintenance and operations as specified in Section 18030 of the Streets and Highways Code, the Landscaping and Lighting District of the City of Rosemead may also perform maintenance and make improvements pursuant to Sections 22525 and 22531 of the Streets and Highways Code.

SECTION 1. In addition to the districts authority to perform street lighting maintenance and operations as specified in Section 18030 of the Streets and Highways Code, the Landscaping and Lighting District of the City of Rosemead may also perform maintenance and make improvements pursuant to Sections 22525 and 22531 of the Streets and Highways Code.

### SECTION 1.

SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special statute is necessary and that a general statute cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique need to perform immediate maintenance and make improvements in the City of Rosemead.

SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special statute is necessary and that a general statute cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique need to perform immediate maintenance and make improvements in the City of Rosemead.

SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special statute is necessary and that a general statute cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique need to perform immediate maintenance and make improvements in the City of Rosemead.

### SEC. 2.