California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB192 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/16/2019

                    Enrolled  August 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  April 25, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 192Introduced by Senator Hertzberg(Coauthors: Assembly Members Kamlager-Dove and Wicks)January 30, 2019 An act to repeal Sections 150 and 1550 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 192, Hertzberg. Posse comitatus.Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000. This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 150 of the Penal Code is repealed.SEC. 2. Section 1550 of the Penal Code is repealed.

 Enrolled  August 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  April 25, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 192Introduced by Senator Hertzberg(Coauthors: Assembly Members Kamlager-Dove and Wicks)January 30, 2019 An act to repeal Sections 150 and 1550 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 192, Hertzberg. Posse comitatus.Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000. This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  April 25, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019

Enrolled  August 16, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  April 25, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Bill 

No. 192

Introduced by Senator Hertzberg(Coauthors: Assembly Members Kamlager-Dove and Wicks)January 30, 2019

Introduced by Senator Hertzberg(Coauthors: Assembly Members Kamlager-Dove and Wicks)
January 30, 2019

 An act to repeal Sections 150 and 1550 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 192, Hertzberg. Posse comitatus.

Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000. This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.

Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000. 

This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 150 of the Penal Code is repealed.SEC. 2. Section 1550 of the Penal Code is repealed.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 150 of the Penal Code is repealed.

SECTION 1. Section 150 of the Penal Code is repealed.

### SECTION 1.



SEC. 2. Section 1550 of the Penal Code is repealed.

SEC. 2. Section 1550 of the Penal Code is repealed.

### SEC. 2.